EP2976645 - CLINICAL DECISION SUPPORT (CDS) FOR RADIOTHERAPY IN PROSTATE CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2016/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIBBING, Carolina c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BITTER, Katrin c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/04] | Representative(s) | Ledeboer, Johannes Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/04] | Application number, filing date | 14714384.6 | 07.03.2014 | [2016/04] | WO2014IB59526 | Priority number, date | US201361803479P | 20.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361803479 P | [2016/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014147509 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2976645 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2976645 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, A61N5/00, G01N33/68, G06F19/00 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
A61N5/103 (EP,US);
G01N33/48 (CN);
G01N33/6848 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (US);
G01N35/00584 (CN);
H01J49/0027 (US);
G01N2800/40 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US);
G16H10/40 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLINISCHE ENTSCHEIDUNGSHILFE FÜR EINE STRAHLENTHERAPIE BEI PROSTATAKREBS | [2016/04] | English: | CLINICAL DECISION SUPPORT (CDS) FOR RADIOTHERAPY IN PROSTATE CANCER | [2016/04] | French: | AIDE À LA DÉCISION CLINIQUE (CDS) ASSOCIÉE À UNE RADIOTHÉRAPIE DU CANCER DE LA PROSTATE | [2016/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 05.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2014 | AL | 05.07.2017 | AT | 05.07.2017 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | ES | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | HR | 05.07.2017 | IT | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | MK | 05.07.2017 | NL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | RS | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | SM | 05.07.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | NO | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | IE | 07.03.2018 | LU | 07.03.2018 | MT | 07.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 07.03.2014 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 07.03.2014 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | |
NO | 05.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008123948 (VERMILLION INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [XY]WO2010136942 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,7-20 * abstract * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 8 * [Y] 2-6; | [XY]WO2011070461 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,7-20 * abstract * * page 15, line 10 - page 16, line 15 * * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 7 * [Y] 2-6; | [XY]WO2013001507 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 11-20 * abstract * * page 3 * [Y] 2-6 | Examination | - STEVEN CARR ET AL, "The need for guidelines in publication of peptide and protein identification data - Working group on publication guidelines for peptide and protein identification data", MOLECULAR & CELLULAR PROTEOMICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, vol. 3, no. 6, doi:10.1074/MCP.T400006-MCP200, ISSN 1535-9476, (20040601), pages 531 - 533, (20040408), XP002616824 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/mcp.T400006-MCP200 |