EP2976544 - ADAPTIVE ELASTIC BEARING AND TUNED MASS DAMPER CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FM Energie GmbH & Co. KG Im Rosengarten 16 64646 Heppenheim / DE | [2016/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSCH, Franz Im Rosengarten 16 64646 Heppenheim / DE | [2016/04] | Representative(s) | Benz, Jürgen Kanzlei Heumann, Benz Spessartring 63 64287 Darmstadt / DE | [2016/04] | Application number, filing date | 14714584.1 | 11.03.2014 | [2016/04] | WO2014EP00642 | Priority number, date | EP20130001404 | 19.03.2013 Original published format: EP 13001404 | EP20130004538 | 17.09.2013 Original published format: EP 13004538 | [2016/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014146763 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2976544 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2976544 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/393 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
F16F1/3935 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE ELASTISCHE LAGER UND SIE ENTHALTENDE SCHWINGUNGSTILGER | [2016/04] | English: | ADAPTIVE ELASTIC BEARING AND TUNED MASS DAMPER CONTAINING SAME | [2016/04] | French: | PALIER ÉLASTIQUE ADAPTATIF ET ABSORBEUR DE VIBRATIONS LE CONTENANT | [2016/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 10.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP18000838.5 / EP3470702 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2014 | AL | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MK | 14.11.2018 | MT | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | RS | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | SM | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | NO | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | AT | 11.03.2019 | IE | 11.03.2019 | LU | 11.03.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.03.2014 | |
AL | 14.11.2018 | ||
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
MT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
AT | 11.03.2019 | ||
IE | 11.03.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
MT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
AT | 11.03.2019 | ||
IE | 11.03.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
MT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
AT | 11.03.2019 | ||
IE | 11.03.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
MT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IE | 11.03.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IE | 11.03.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IE | 11.03.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]DE4033569 (METZELER GIMETALL AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8,12,13,16,19 * the whole document * [Y] 6,9,14,15,17 [I] 18; | [Y]EP1286076 (MITSCH FRANZ [DE]) [Y] 17* paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figure 8 *; | [Y]DE102005028565 (CONTITECH LUFTFEDERSYST GMBH [DE]) [Y] 11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US7389977 (FERNANDEZ PAUL M [US], et al) [Y] 6,17 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 10; figure 3 *; | [XY]WO2010054808 (MITSCH FRANZ [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,10,13,19-22 * the whole document * [Y] 11; | [Y]WO2013023724 (FM EN GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 9,14,15 * page 8, line 12 - page 9, line 14; figure 6 * |