EP2981845 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A DOSE OF IONIZING RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CERN - European Organization For Nuclear Research 1211 Geneva 23 / CH | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINCKE, Helmut 86 Rue des Moraines F-01170 Chevry / FR | 02 /
TRUMMER, Julia 262 route de Segny Bretigny F-01280 Prevessin Moens / FR | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 14714627.8 | 24.03.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014EP55783 | Priority number, date | EP20130162320 | 04.04.2013 Original published format: EP 13162320 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014161732 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2981845 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/06 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
G01T1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER IONISIERUNGSSTRAHLUNGSDOSIS | [2016/06] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A DOSE OF IONIZING RADIATION | [2016/06] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE DOSE DE RAYONNEMENT IONISANT | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 24.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 20.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2200984 (OPTICAL DATA COMMUNICATIONS LT) [A] 1,16 * page 1, line 21 - page 2; figure - *; | [A]DE19528096 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5-7,16-18 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 10; figure - * | [IA] - H. SCHONBACHER ET AL, "High-level dosimetric methods", RADIATION PROTECTION DOSIMETRY, (20091101), vol. 137, no. 1-2, doi:10.1093/rpd/ncp195, ISSN 0144-8420, pages 83 - 93, XP055121992 [I] 1-4,8-10,12,14-16 * page 1, column r - page 3, column l; figure - * [A] 5-7,17,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/rpd/ncp195 | by applicant | US2010176308 |