EP2961370 - MICROCAPSULES COMPRISING SUNSCREEN AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tagra Biotechnologies Ltd 8 HaMelacha Street P.O. Box 8213 Kiryat Nordau Industry Zone 4250543 Natania / IL | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDSTEIN, Danny Kibbutz Dafna P.O. Box 161 1223500 Upper Galilee / IL | 02 /
PRIVALOVA, Olga P.O. Box 41 Kibbutz LeHavot HaBashan 1212500 Doar-Na Upper Galilee / IL | 03 /
BEN-ALTABET, Lior P.O. Box 248 Kibbutz Dafna 1223500 Doar-Na Galil Elyon 2 / IL | 04 /
MENACHEM, Yaniv Moshav Dishon 1382500 Doar-Na Merom HaGalil / IL | 05 /
HAJ, Hanan 93 Rehaniya 1381800 Doar-Na Merom HaGalil / IL | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14715123.7 | 27.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014IL50207 | Priority number, date | US201361770773P | 28.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361770773 P | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014132261 | Date: | 04.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2961370 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2961370 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/40, A61K8/29, A61K8/02, A61K8/81, A61Q17/04, A61K8/73, A61K8/35, A61Q19/00, A61K8/11 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
A61K8/11 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/29 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/35 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/40 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,BR,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,BR,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,BR,US);
A61K2800/262 (EP,BR,US);
A61K2800/30 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | A61K8/29, A61K8/35, A61K8/73, A61Q17/04, A61K8/81, A61K8/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROKAPSELN MIT SONNENSCHUTZMITTEL | [2016/01] | English: | MICROCAPSULES COMPRISING SUNSCREEN AGENTS | [2016/01] | French: | MICROCAPSULES COMPRENANT DES AGENTS DE PROTECTION SOLAIRE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 02.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20176279.6 / EP3721860 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2014 | AL | 23.12.2020 | AT | 23.12.2020 | CY | 23.12.2020 | CZ | 23.12.2020 | EE | 23.12.2020 | FI | 23.12.2020 | HR | 23.12.2020 | LT | 23.12.2020 | LV | 23.12.2020 | MC | 23.12.2020 | MK | 23.12.2020 | MT | 23.12.2020 | NL | 23.12.2020 | PL | 23.12.2020 | RO | 23.12.2020 | RS | 23.12.2020 | SI | 23.12.2020 | SK | 23.12.2020 | SM | 23.12.2020 | LU | 27.02.2021 | BG | 23.03.2021 | NO | 23.03.2021 | GR | 24.03.2021 | IS | 23.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.02.2014 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
MK | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 27.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 27.02.2014 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 27.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 27.02.2014 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 27.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 27.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 27.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3737337 (SCHNORING H, et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,14-16,22-24,32-34 * examples 4, 7 *; | [XY]US5455048 (LAHMANI PAUL [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,12,14-16,20,22-25,27,32-34 * column 1, line 36 - line 42 * * page 2, line 58 - line 61; example 4 * [Y] 1-27,31-34; | [XY]JPH09194343 (KOSE CORP) [X] 1,2,4-7,10-12,16,22-27,32-34 * abstract * [Y] 1-27,31-34; | [XY]JP2001096146 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6,16,22-27,32-34 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0053] - [0058] * [Y] 1-27,31-34; | [XY]US6242099 (GRANDMONTAGNE BERNARD [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,10-12,16,22-27,32-34 * page 1, line 41 - line 43 * * page 2, line 23 - line 28 * * example -; claims 1, 6-11, 16-17 * [Y] 1-27,31-34; | [XD]US6932984 (BABTSOV VLADIMIR [IL], et al) [XD] 1-9,12,14-17,22-25,31,33,34 * example 8 *; | [XY]US2012148647 (WALZEL BERND [CH], et al) [X] 1-7,11,12,14-16,22-25,32-34 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 141]; examples 3,6 * [Y] 1-27,31-34; | [XY] - "Hybrid UV Filters", Sunjin Newsletter, (2011), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.sunjinchem.co.kr/cosmetics/cosmetics_pdf2/Flyer-Hybrid.pdf, (20140613), XP055123245 [X] 1-7,10-12,14-16,18-27,32-34 * page 1, column 2, line 4 * [Y] 1-27,31-34 | [XY] - "Hybrid Abomc", (20110102), URL: http://www.sunjinchem.co.kr/cosmetics/cosmetics_pdf2/SPF PA 부스팅 효과가 뛰어난 HYBRID ABOMC 개요 및 적용 예.pdf, (20140613), XP055123242 [X] 1-7,10-12,14-16,22-25,32-34 * pages 2-16 * [Y] 1-27,31-34 | Examination | US2009053153 | by applicant | US6303149 | US6932984 | EP1899015 | WO2009138978 | US7838037 | WO2012156965 | - MARCATO ET AL., "Nanostructured polymer and lipid carriers for sunscreen. Biological effects and skin permeation", J. NANOSCIENCE AND NANOTECHNOLOGY, (2011), vol. 11, pages 1880 - 1886 | - BURNETT; WANG, "Current sunscreen controversies: a critical review", PHOTODERMATOLOGY, PHOTOIMMUNOLOGY & PHOTOMEDICINE, (2011), vol. 27, pages 58 - 67 | - Remington: The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1995), pages 1399 - 1404 |