EP2986925 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR A MULTI-LAYER ELEMENT COMPRISING A PROTECTIVE COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/08] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTILAYER ELEMENT HAVING A PROTECTIVE COATING | ||
[2016/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states Université de Lorraine 34 Cours Léopold 54000 Nancy / FR | [2017/08] |
Former [2016/08] | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | |||
For all designated states Université de Lorraine 34 Cours Leopold 54000 Nancy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALLAIS, Damien 243 Chemin du Mas F-38330 St Ismier / FR | 02 /
PROST, Laurent 3 rue Fernand Leger F-91190 Gif Sur Yvette / FR | 03 /
DEL-GALLO, Pascal 5 rue de la Chapelle St Laurent F-91410 Dourdan / FR | 04 /
WAGNER, Marc 19 rue Louis Dupré F-94100 Saint Maur Des Fosses / FR | 05 /
VILASI, Michel 19 rue du Hameau F-54136 Bouxieres Aux Dames / FR | 06 /
MAZET, Thierry 31 rue de Cronstadt F-54000 Nancy / FR | 07 /
MATHIEU, Stéphane 62 rue de l'Ermitage F-54600 Villers Les Nancy / FR | [2016/27] |
Former [2016/08] | 01 /
SALLAIS, Damien 4 avenue des Etats-Unis F-78000 Versailles / FR | ||
02 /
PROST, Laurent 3 rue Fernand Leger F-91190 Gif Sur Yvette / FR | |||
03 /
DEL-GALLO, Pascal 5 rue de la Chapelle St Laurent F-91410 Dourdan / FR | |||
04 /
WAGNER, Marc 19 rue Louis Dupré F-94100 Saint Maur Des Fosses / FR | |||
05 /
VILASI, Michel 19 rue du Hameau F-54136 Bouxieres Aux Dames / FR | |||
06 /
MAZET, Thierry 31 rue de Cronstadt F-54000 Nancy / FR | |||
07 /
MATHIEU, Stéphane 62 rue de l'Ermitage F-54600 Villers Les Nancy / FR | Representative(s) | Laigneau, Amandine L'Air Liquide Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Beroud, Amandine L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14715375.3 | 17.03.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014FR50615 | Priority number, date | FR20130053614 | 19.04.2013 Original published format: FR 1353614 | [2016/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014170570 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986925 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2986925 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00, F28F3/08, F28F19/06, F28F21/08, C23C10/48, C23C10/60, C23C18/08, C22F1/10 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
F28F3/08 (EP,US);
F28F13/18 (US);
C22F1/10 (EP,US);
C23C10/48 (EP,US);
C23C10/60 (EP,US);
C23C18/08 (US);
F28D9/0037 (EP,US);
F28F19/06 (EP,US);
F28F21/089 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/08] | F28F3/08, F28F19/06, F28F21/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRSCHICHTIGEN ELEMENTS MIT SCHUTZSCHICHT | [2016/40] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR A MULTI-LAYER ELEMENT COMPRISING A PROTECTIVE COATING | [2016/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN ÉLÉMENT MULTICOUCHE PRÉSENTANT UN REVÊTEMENT PROTECTEUR | [2016/08] |
Former [2016/08] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRSCHICHTIGEN ELEMENTS MIT EINER SCHUTZSCHICHT | ||
Former [2016/08] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTILAYER ELEMENT HAVING A PROTECTIVE COATING | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 31.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2014 | AL | 22.02.2017 | AT | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | MT | 22.02.2017 | PL | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | RS | 22.02.2017 | SE | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | TR | 22.02.2017 | IE | 17.03.2017 | LU | 17.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.03.2014 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
TR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 17.03.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 17.03.2014 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 17.03.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 17.03.2014 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 17.03.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.03.2014 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 17.03.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 17.03.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 17.03.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3709278 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE [DE], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 32; figures 4-6 *; | [A]DE19834238 (ROEDERS JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 6 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-50 ** column 4, lines 24-41 *; | [A]US2003022008 (JOGAN SHIGETOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US7186388 (BOWE MICHAEL JOSEPH [GB], et al) [A] 1,6-10 * column 2, lines 18-60; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 16 *; | [A]US2007210037 (ISHIDA TOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0012] - [0017] - [0051] - [0076]; figures 1-7D,9 *; | [A]US2010051248 (INATOMI TAKANARI [JP], et al) [A] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] - [0011] - [0105] - [0118]; figures 1-6 * |