EP2979282 - MULTIPLE INDUCTIVE COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/11] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2016/05] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACKERMANN, Bernd High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
ELFERICH, Reinhold High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
JOHN, David Llewellyn High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | 01 /
ACKERMANN, Bernd c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
ELFERICH, Reinhold c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
JOHN, David Llewellyn c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2016/05] | 01 /
ACKERMANN, Bernd c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
ELFERICH, Reinhold c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
JOHN, David Llewellyn c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus, et al Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 14715690.5 | 17.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014IB59887 | Priority number, date | US201361806456P | 29.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361806456 P | [2016/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014155235 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2979282 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01F3/14, H01F17/04, H01F27/26 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
H05B45/375 (EP,US);
H01F17/045 (EP,US);
H01F17/06 (US);
H01F27/24 (US);
H01F27/26 (EP,US);
H01F27/2823 (US);
H01F3/14 (EP,US);
H02M1/42 (US);
H02M7/06 (US);
H05B45/38 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Title | German: | MEHRFACHE INDUKTIVE KOMPONENTE | [2016/05] | English: | MULTIPLE INDUCTIVE COMPONENT | [2016/05] | French: | ÉLÉMENT INDUCTIF MULTIPLE | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 06.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]JPS55105926U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1,3,5,6 * figure 1 * [A] 2,4 [I] 7-14; | [A]JP2003133139 (TOKO INC) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]EP1883083 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * |