01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
08.03.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
14.05.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
30.03.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
27.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.11.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.08.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
29.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.05.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
18.12.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
18.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.10.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.10.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
13.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.04.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|