Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10479727 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2019 | B2 | US2016039714 | 11.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013006237 | 11.04.2013 | WO2014EP56777 | 04.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6366679B | Global Dossier | 01.08.2018 | B2 | JP2016522133 | 28.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102013006237 | 11.04.2013 | WO2014EP56777 | 04.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109516702 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102013006237 | 11.04.2013 | CN201480001142 | 04.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104350022 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102013006237 | 11.04.2013 | WO2014EP56777 | 04.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2984054 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013006237 | 11.04.2013 | WO2014EP56777 | 04.04.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014166822 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013006237 | 11.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102013006237 | 16.06.2016 | B4 | DE102013006237 | 16.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013006237 | 11.04.2013 |