EP2984054 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A PLANT FOR PRODUCING CEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHD Humboldt Wedag GmbH Colonia-Allee 3 51067 Köln / DE | [2016/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STREIT, Norbert Alfred-Keller-Straße 18 53721 Siegburg / DE | 02 /
FEISS, Marc Düsseldorfer Straße 125 51063 Köln / DE | [2016/14] |
Former [2016/07] | 01 /
STREIT, Norbert Alfred-Keller-Straße 18 53721 Siegburg / DE | ||
02 /
FEISS, Marc Düsseldorfer Straße 145 51063 Köln / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 14716778.7 | 04.04.2014 | [2016/07] | WO2014EP56777 | Priority number, date | DE20131006237 | 11.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013006237 | [2016/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014166822 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2984054 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C04B7/44, C04B7/36 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
C04B7/364 (EP,US);
C04B7/365 (US);
C04B7/432 (US);
C04B7/4446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZEMENT | [2016/07] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A PLANT FOR PRODUCING CEMENT | [2016/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE INSTALLATION SERVANT À FABRIQUER DU CIMENT | [2016/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 11.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/13] | 17.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/13] | Appeal following examination | 08.10.2018 | Appeal received No. T2810/18 | 25.10.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.02.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0155048 (KRUPP POLYSIUS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]EP1180501 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT WEDAG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2005108892 (SMIDTH AS F L [DK], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE102005057346 (KHD HUMBOLDT WEDAG GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0020] * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2008120109 (SMIDTH AS F L [DK], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 6, line 15 - page 10, line 15 * * figures 2,3,5 * |