EP2976635 - APPARATUS FOR THE NONDESTRUCTIF CONTROL OF TUBULAR PRODUCTS WITH ELECTROACOUSTIC PHASED ARRAYS, IN PARTICULAR ON-SITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/04] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE NON-DESTRUCTIVE CONTROL OF TUBULAR PRODUCTS USING ELECTROACOUSTIC PHASED NETWORKS, IN PARTICULAR ON SITE | ||
[2021/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vallourec Tubes France 12 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2021/52] |
Former [2016/04] | For all designated states Vallourec Tubes France 27 Avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENEUVILLE, François 9 route de Cartignies F-59550 Beaurepaire sur Sambre / FR | [2016/04] | Representative(s) | Marsolais, Richard Vallourec Tubes DPI 12 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2022/02] |
Former [2016/04] | Marsolais, Richard Vallourec Tubes DPI 27 avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 14716895.9 | 19.03.2014 | [2016/04] | WO2014FR50643 | Priority number, date | FR20130052548 | 21.03.2013 Original published format: FR 1352548 | [2016/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014147344 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2976635 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2976635 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/22, G01N29/24, G01N29/26, G01N29/265 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
G01N29/265 (EP,US);
G01N29/225 (EP,US);
G01N29/2456 (EP,US);
G01N29/262 (EP,US);
G01N2291/056 (EP,US);
G01N2291/106 (EP,US);
G01N2291/2634 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIEN KONTROLLE VON ROHREN MIT ELEKTROAKUSTISCHEN GRUPPENWANDLERN, INSBESONDERE VOR ORT | [2021/31] | English: | APPARATUS FOR THE NONDESTRUCTIF CONTROL OF TUBULAR PRODUCTS WITH ELECTROACOUSTIC PHASED ARRAYS, IN PARTICULAR ON-SITE | [2021/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE NON DESTRUCTIF DE PRODUITS TUBULAIRES AVEC DES RÉSEAUX EN PHASE ÉLECTROACOUSTIQUES, NOTAMMENT SUR SITE | [2021/31] |
Former [2016/04] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIEN STEUERUNG VON SCHLAUCHFÖRMIGEN PRODUKTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ELEKTROAKUSTISCHEN PHASENGESTEUERTEN NETZWERKEN, INSBESONDERE VOR ORT | ||
Former [2016/04] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE NON-DESTRUCTIVE CONTROL OF TUBULAR PRODUCTS USING ELECTROACOUSTIC PHASED NETWORKS, IN PARTICULAR ON SITE | ||
Former [2016/04] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE NON DESTRUCTIF DE PRODUITS TUBULAIRES AVEC DES RÉSEAUX EN PHASE ÉLECTROACOUSTIQUES, NOTAMMENT SUR SITE | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 03.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2019 | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2014 | AL | 12.01.2022 | AT | 12.01.2022 | CY | 12.01.2022 | CZ | 12.01.2022 | DK | 12.01.2022 | EE | 12.01.2022 | ES | 12.01.2022 | FI | 12.01.2022 | HR | 12.01.2022 | IT | 12.01.2022 | LT | 12.01.2022 | LV | 12.01.2022 | MC | 12.01.2022 | MK | 12.01.2022 | MT | 12.01.2022 | NL | 12.01.2022 | PL | 12.01.2022 | RO | 12.01.2022 | RS | 12.01.2022 | SE | 12.01.2022 | SI | 12.01.2022 | SK | 12.01.2022 | SM | 12.01.2022 | IE | 19.03.2022 | LU | 19.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | BG | 12.04.2022 | NO | 12.04.2022 | GR | 13.04.2022 | IS | 12.05.2022 | PT | 12.05.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.03.2014 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
MK | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 19.03.2022 | ||
LU | 19.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 19.03.2014 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 19.03.2022 | ||
LU | 19.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 19.03.2014 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 19.03.2022 | ||
LU | 19.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 19.03.2022 | ||
LU | 19.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 19.03.2022 | ||
LU | 19.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 19.03.2022 | ||
LU | 19.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 19.03.2022 | ||
LU | 19.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 12.01.2022 | |
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 12.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP2138837 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [Y] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0021] *; | [Y]EP1830185 (INTELLIGENDT SYS & SERV GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0023] *; | [Y]US2008314154 (FETZER BARRY A [US], et al) [Y] 1,23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] - [0040] * | Examination | - Guillaume Neau ET AL, "The promise of ultrasonic phased arrays and the role of modeling in specifying systems", ASNT Fall Conference & Quality Testing Show, Houston, US, (20061027), URL: http://www.bercli.net/docs/ANSTpaperBERCLI_homeformat.pdf, (20190424), XP055583063 | - Anonymous, "Phased array ultrasonics - Wikipedia", (20190101), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Phased_array_ultrasonics, (20190424), XP055583053 | by applicant | US7975549 | US7984650 | US5526691 | US5549004 | US7516664 | WO03050527 |