EP2981911 - METHOD AND APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR DATA CACHE HANDLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King.com Limited Aragon House Business Centre Dragonara Road St. Julians STJ 3140 / MT | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STYMNE, Patrik c/o Midasplayer AB Sankt Eriksgatan 113 S-11343 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
SJÖDIN, Lars c/o Midasplayer AB Sankt Eriksgatan 113 S-11343 Stockholm / SE | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 14717116.9 | 03.04.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014EP56755 | Priority number, date | GB20130006035 | 03.04.2013 Original published format: GB 201306035 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014161968 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2981911 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, H04L29/08, G06F12/08 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
G06F12/0866 (EP,US);
G06F16/24 (US);
G06F12/0897 (EP,US);
G06F16/22 (EP,US);
G06F16/24552 (EP,US);
H04L67/568 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR DATENCACHE-VERARBEITUNG | [2016/06] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR DATA CACHE HANDLING | [2016/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'ANTÉMÉMOIRE DE DONNÉES | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 06.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/09] | 17.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.10.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6199107 (DUJARI RAJEEV [US]) [A] 1-18 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 54; figures 2,3 * * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 52; figures 9-11 *; | [XI]WO0198920 (IDT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-15 * page 8, line 9 - page 16, line 2; figures 1-4 * [I] 7-9,16-18; | [A]US7565423 (FREDRICKSEN ERIC RUSSELL [US]) [A] 7-9,16-18 * column 9, line 58 - column 10, line 34 ** column 20, line 55 - column 22, line 35 *; | [X]US8171114 (DALE SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * column 4, line 27 - column 7, line 51; figures 2-4 *; | [A]WO2012091693 (LIMELIGHT NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 6, line 1 - page 10, line 27; figures 2A,2B * | Examination | US2004128346 | WO2011019517 | US2012054440 | WO2012071384 |