EP2991508 - INFANT FORMULA WITH A LOW CONTENT OF MCFAS IN SPECIFIC PROPORTIONS AND A RELATIVELY HIGH CONTENT OF UNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS, AND ITS USE IN PROMOTING THE HEALTHY ESTABLISHMENT OF COGNITIVE FUNCTION IN INFANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESTAILLATS, Frederic Ch. en Rutty 14 CH-1077 Servion / CH | 02 /
NAGY, Kornél Ch. du Calvaire 17 CH-1005 Lausanne / CH | 03 /
THAKKAR, Sagar Chemin de la Bergerie 27 CH-1806 St-Legier / CH | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | Gagliardi, Tatiana Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | Gagliardi, Tatiana Nestec SA CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 14717427.0 | 02.04.2014 | [2016/10] | WO2014EP56582 | Priority number, date | EP20130163186 | 10.04.2013 Original published format: EP 13163186 | [2016/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014166790 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2991508 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/10, A23L33/00 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A23L33/00 (RU);
A23L33/10 (RU);
A23L33/115 (EP,RU,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/20 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A23V2200/30 (EP,US);
A23V2200/322 (EP,US);
A23V2250/1862 (EP,US);
A23V2250/1868 (EP,US);
A23V2250/1878 (EP,US);
A23V2250/1882 (EP,US);
A23V2250/1944 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2200/30, A23V2200/322, A23V2250/1862, A23V2250/1868, A23V2250/1878, A23V2250/1882, A23V2250/1944 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Title | German: | SÄUGLINGSNAHRUNG MIT GERINGEM MCFAS-ANTEIL IN SPEZIFISCHEM VERHÄLTNIS UND EINEM RELATIV HOHEN ANTEIL AN UNGESÄTTIGTEN FETTSÄUREN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR FÖRDERUNG DES GESUNDEN AUFBAUS DER KOGNITIVEN FUNKTION BEI KLEINKINDERN | [2016/10] | English: | INFANT FORMULA WITH A LOW CONTENT OF MCFAS IN SPECIFIC PROPORTIONS AND A RELATIVELY HIGH CONTENT OF UNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS, AND ITS USE IN PROMOTING THE HEALTHY ESTABLISHMENT OF COGNITIVE FUNCTION IN INFANTS | [2016/10] | French: | LAIT INFANTILE À TENEUR FAIBLE EN ACIDES GRAS À CHAÎNE MOYENNE ET À TENEUR RELATIVEMENT ÉLEVÉE EN ACIDES GRAS INSATURÉS, ET SON UTILISATION POUR FAVORISER LE BON ÉTABLISSEMENT DES FONCTIONS COGNITIVES CHEZ LES NOURRISSONS | [2016/10] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 26.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IDY]US5709888 (GIL ANGEL H [ES], et al); | [IY]US6034130 (WANG JUNKUAN [CH], et al); | [Y]US2002045660 (O'CONNOR DEBORAH L [CA], et al); | [IY]US2010234286 (GEORGI GILDA [DE], et al); | [IY]US2012121757 (ZWIJSEN RENATE MARIA LOUISE [NL], et al); | Examination | CN102217753 | WO2013191533 |