EP2961581 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A MOULDING USING A WATER-SOLUBLE CASTING MOULD AND MATERIAL SYSTEM FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states voxeljet AG Paul-Lenz-Strasse 1 b 86316 Friedberg / DE | For all designated states Fluidsolids AG Zimmerlistrasse 6 8004 Zürich / CH | [2019/50] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states voxeljet AG Paul-Lenz-Strasse 1 b 86316 Friedberg / DE | ||
For all designated states Fluid Solids AG Zimmerlistrasse 6 8004 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÜNTHER, Daniel Aberlestr. 13 81371 München / DE | 02 /
GNÜCHTEL, Ingo Wittelsbacherstr. 26 86504 Merching / DE | 03 /
KARRER, Beat Hardtumstr. 132a CH-8005 Zürich / CH | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Helbig, Christian Wagner + Helbig Patentanwälte Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14717982.4 | 18.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014DE00063 | Priority number, date | DE20131003303 | 28.02.2013 Original published format: DE102013003303 | [2016/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014131388 | Date: | 04.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2961581 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2961581 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/34, B28B7/36, B29C33/52, B29C33/56, B29C67/00 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
B28B7/342 (EP,US);
B28B7/346 (EP,US);
B28B7/36 (EP,US);
B29C33/52 (EP,US);
B29C33/56 (EP,US);
B29C64/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES FORMTEILS MIT EINER WASSERLÖSLICHEN GUSSFORM SOWIE MATERIALSYSTEM ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2016/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A MOULDING USING A WATER-SOLUBLE CASTING MOULD AND MATERIAL SYSTEM FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2016/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PIÈCE MOULÉE AU MOYEN D'UN MOULE HYDROSOLUBLE ET SYSTÈME DE MATÉRIAUX POUR LA PRODUCTION DE CE DERNIER | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 15.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2019 | 13.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2014 | AL | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | IT | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.02.2014 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MK | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 18.02.2014 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 18.02.2014 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]FR515824 (HENRI COANDA [FR]) [X] 10 * page 1, lines 12-23 * [Y] 7-9 [I] 1-5; | [YD]US5089186 (MOORE TIMOTHY M [US], et al) [YD] 7-9 * column 4, lines 32-38 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 3 *; | [XI]JP2004082206 (MARUTANI YOJI) [X] 1,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0013] , [0016] , [0018] , [0020] , [0030] , [0032] * [I] 2-6,8; | [A]EP1974838 (TOMITA PHARMA [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0015] - [0019] - [0027] , [0028] , [0056] , [0060] *; | [A]JP2009202451 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0010] * | by applicant | DE19525307 | DE69125064T | DE102005019699 |