Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9530580 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2016 | B2 | US2016035505 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57616 | 15.04.2014 | DE102013207436 | 24.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150134388 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57616 | 15.04.2014 | DE102013207436 | 24.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016517153 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57616 | 15.04.2014 | DE102013207436 | 24.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105190815B | Global Dossier | 16.02.2018 | B | CN105190815 | 23.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57616 | 15.04.2014 | DE102013207436 | 24.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2956950 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57616 | 15.04.2014 | DE102013207436 | 24.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201507253 | 29.03.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57616 | 15.04.2014 | DE102013207436 | 24.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014173728 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013207436 | 24.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102013207436 | 02.06.2021 | B4 | DE102013207436 | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013207436 | 24.04.2013 |