EP2978842 - GLUCAN BRANCHING ENZYMES AND THEIR METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matis ohf. Vinlandsleid 12 113 Reykjavik / IS | [2018/13] |
Former [2016/05] | For all designated states Matis ohf. Vinlandsleid 12 113 Reykjavik / IS | ||
For all designated states Rijksuniversiteit Groningen Broerstraat 5 9712 CP Groningen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONSSON WHEAT, Jon Oskar Veghusum 7 IS-112 Reykjavik / IS | 02 /
HREGGVIDSSON, GudmundurOli Thorsgotu 17 IS-101 Reykjavik / IS | 03 /
FRIDJONSSON, Olafur Hedinn Storagerdi 34 IS-108 Reykjavik / IS | 04 /
DOBRUCHOWSKA, Justyna M. Department of Microbiology Groningen Biomolecular Sciences and Biotechnology Institute (GBB) Nijenborgh 7 NL-9747 AG Groningen / NL | 05 /
KAMERLING, Johannis P. Department of Microbiology Groningen Biomolecular Sciences and Biotechnology Institute (GBB) Nijenborgh 7 NL-9747 AG Groningen / NL | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Arnason Faktor Intellectual Property Consulting Gudridarstig 2-4 113 Reykjavik / IS | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | Arnason Faktor Intellectual Property Consulting Gudridarstig 2-4 113 Reykjavik / IS | Application number, filing date | 14718180.4 | 26.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014IS50003 | Priority number, date | US201361805360P | 26.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361805360 P | [2016/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014155395 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2978842 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2978842 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
C12N9/1051 (EP,US);
C12P19/18 (US);
C08B37/0024 (US);
C12P19/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLUCANVERZWEIGUNGSENZYME UND DEREN VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2016/05] | English: | GLUCAN BRANCHING ENZYMES AND THEIR METHODS OF USE | [2016/05] | French: | ENZYMES DE RAMIFICATION DE GLUCANE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 20.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Request for further processing for: | 20.07.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.08.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2014 | AL | 02.05.2018 | AT | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | DK | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | ES | 02.05.2018 | HR | 02.05.2018 | IT | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | PL | 02.05.2018 | RO | 02.05.2018 | RS | 02.05.2018 | SI | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | TR | 02.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | GR | 03.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | PT | 03.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.03.2014 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [AD] - Jón Óskar Jónsson ET AL, "[beta]-Glucan Transferases of Family GH17 from Proteobacteria", (20100101), URL: http://skemman.is/stream/get/1946/7050/19017/1/Beta-Glucan_Transferases_from_Proteobacteria.pdf, (20140708), XP055127410 [AD] 1-12,16-20 * figure 38B * * figure 37 * * page 39 - page 41 * | [AD] - G. O. HREGGVIDSSON ET AL, "Exploring novel non-Leloir -glucosyltransferases from proteobacteria for modifying linear ( 1->3)-linked gluco-oligosaccharide chains", GLYCOBIOLOGY, (20110301), vol. 21, no. 3, doi:10.1093/glycob/cwq165, ISSN 0959-6658, pages 304 - 328, XP055127468 [AD] 1-12,16-20 * abstract * * page 324, column l, line 6 - line 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/cwq165 | [AD] - A. GASTEBOIS ET AL, "Characterization of a New (1-3)-Glucan Branching Activity of Aspergillus fumigatus", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20100122), vol. 285, no. 4, doi:10.1074/jbc.M109.077545, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 2386 - 2396, XP055127415 [AD] 1-12,16-20 * page 2387, column r * * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M109.077545 | [XP] - J P Kamerling, "Analysis of glycans synthesized by microbial trans-glycosylating enzymes", (20140101), URL: http://ics27bangalore.in/abstracct-download/Plant-animal-Industrial-polysaccharides/V-A-IL-1.pdf, (20140709), XP055127811 [XP] 1-12,16-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4683195 | US4683202 | - BADULESCU, M.; APETREI, N. S.; LUPU, A. R.; CREMER, L.; SZEGLI, G.; MOSCOVICI, M.; MOCANU, G.; MIHAI, D.; C?LUG?RU, A., "Curdlan derivatives able to enhance cytostatic drugs activity on tumor cells", ROUMANIAN ARCHIVES OF MICROBIOLOGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 68, pages 201 - 206 | - BHAGWAT, A. A.; D. L. KEISTER, "Site-directed mutagenesis of the b-(1,3),b-(1,6)-D-glucan synthesis locus of Bradyrhizobiumjaponicum", MOL.PLANT-MICROBE INTERACT., (1995), vol. 8, pages 366 - 370 | - BHAGWAT, A. A.; MITH6FER, A.; PFEFFER, P. E.; KRAUS, C.; SPICKERS, N.; HOTCHKISS, A.; EBEL, J. ET AL., "Further studies of the role of cyclic beta-glucans in symbiosis. An NdvC mutant of Bradyrhizobiumjaponicum synthesizes cyclodecakis-(1-->3)-beta-glucosyl", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 119, no. 3, pages 1057 - 1064 | - DELAMUTA J.R.; RIBEIRO R.A.; ORMENO-ORRILLO E.; MELO I.S.; MARTINEZ-ROMERO E.; HUNGRIA M., "Polyphasic evidence supporting the reclassification of Bradyrhizobiumjaponicum group Ia strains as Bradyrhizobium diazoefficiens sp. nov", INT J SYST EVOL MICROBIOL., (2013), vol. 63, pages 3342 - 3351 | - GASTEBOIS, A.; MOUYNA, I.; SIMENEL, C.; CLAVAUD, C.; CODDEVILLE, B.; DELEPIERRE, M.; LATGE, J.; FONTAINE, T., "Characterization of a new ?(1-3)-glucan branching activity of Aspergillus fumigatus", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 285, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M109.077545, pages 2386 - 2396, XP055127415 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M109.077545 | - HREGGVIDSSON, G. 0.; DOBRUCHOWSKA, J. M.; FRIDJONSSON, O. H.; JONSSON, J. 0.; GERWIG G. J.; AEVARSSON, A.; KRISTJANSSON J. K.; CUR, "Exploring novel non-Leloir ?-glucosyltransferases from proteobacteria for modifying linear (?1?3)-linked gluco-oligosaccharide chains", GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2011), vol. 21, pages 304 - 328,664-688 | - MCINTOSH, M.; STONE, B. A.; STANISICH, V. A., "Curdlan and other bacterial (1?3)-?-D-glucans", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 68, doi:doi:10.1007/s00253-005-1959-5, pages 163 - 173, XP019331912 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-005-1959-5 | - MOTEJADDED, H.; ALTENBUCHNER, J., "Construction of a dual-tag system for gene expression, protein affinity purification and fusion protein processing", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (2009), vol. 31, pages 543 - 549, XP019670290 |