EP2981550 - ARTIFICIAL TRANSCRIPTION FACTORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES CAUSED BY OPA1 HAPLOINSUFFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Change: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | 11.11.2016 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aliophtha AG Elisabethenstrasse 43 4051 Basel / CH | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUTZNER, Albert Schwarzwaldblick 7 79418 Schliengen / DE | 02 /
FLAMMER, Josef Ob dem Hügliacker 76 4102 Binningen / CH | 03 /
HUXLEY, Alice Huebweg 25 4102 Binningen / CH | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Austrasse 24 4051 Basel / CH | [2016/06] | Application number, filing date | 14718351.1 | 02.04.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014EP56590 | Priority number, date | EP20130162189 | 03.04.2013 Original published format: EP 13162189 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014161881 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2981550 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
C07K14/435 (US);
A61K38/17 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K2319/09 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Extension states | BA | 29.10.2015 | ME | 29.10.2015 | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCHE TRANSKRIPTIONSFAKTOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN DURCH OPA1-HAPLOINSUFFIZIENZ | [2016/06] | English: | ARTIFICIAL TRANSCRIPTION FACTORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES CAUSED BY OPA1 HAPLOINSUFFICIENCY | [2016/06] | French: | FACTEURS DE TRANSCRIPTION ARTIFICIELLE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'INSUFFISANCE HAPLOÏDE | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 28.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 28.06.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 29.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/50] | 29.07.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - SERA ET AL, "Zinc-finger-based artificial transcription factors and their applications", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 61, no. 7-8, doi:10.1016/J.ADDR.2009.03.012, ISSN 0169-409X, (20090702), pages 513 - 526, (20090423), XP026139402 [X] 1-6,9-13 * page 515, column r, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 517, column l, paragraph 2 - paragraph 6 * * page 519, column r, paragraph 3 * * page 522, column r, paragraph 3 - paragraph l * * table 1 * * figure 3 * [I] 7,8,14-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2009.03.012 | [XI] - PAPWORTH M ET AL, "Designer zinc-finger proteins and their applications", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 366, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.GENE.2005.09.011, ISSN 0378-1119, (20060117), pages 27 - 38, (20060117), XP024934269 [X] 1-6,9-13 * page 29, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 2 * * page 31, column r, paragraph 2 - page 32, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 32, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 1 * [I] 7,8,14-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.gene.2005.09.011 | [XI] - GONZALEZ BEATRIZ ET AL, "Modular system for the construction of zinc-finger libraries and proteins", NATURE PROTOCOLS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20100401), vol. 5, no. 4, doi:10.1038/NPROT.2010.34, ISSN 1750-2799, pages 791 - 810, XP009170506 [X] 1-6,9-13 * page 792, column l, paragraph 1 - column r, paragraph 1 * * table 1 * [I] 7,8,14-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2010.34 | [A] - LIU PEI-QI ET AL, "Isogenic human cell lines for drug discovery: Regulation of target gene expression by engineered zinc-finger protein transcription factors", JOURNAL OF BIOMOLECULAR SCREENING, (200506), vol. 10, no. 4, ISSN 1087-0571, pages 304 - 313, XP002700123 [A] 1-22 * abstract * * page 305, column l, paragraph l * * page 306, column r, paragraph l - page 308, column l, paragraph 1 * * figures 1, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/1087057104272663 | [A] - DELETTRE CÉCILE ET AL, "Gene structure and chromosomal localization of mouse Opa1 : its exclusion from the Bst locus", BMC GENETICS, BIOMED CENTRAL, GB, (20030507), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2156-4-8, ISSN 1471-2156, page 8, XP021014352 [A] 1-22 * page 3, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2156-4-8 | [A] - HUANG NI ET AL, "Characterising and predicting haploinsufficiency in the human genome.", PLOS GENETICS OCT 2010, (201010), vol. 6, no. 10, ISSN 1553-7404, page e1001154, XP055069788 [A] 1-22 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pgen.1001154 |