EP2988621 - IMPROVED HAIR COLOURING SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seminara, Angelo 37 Weston Park London N8 9SY / GB | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 14718421.2 | 17.04.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014EP57951 | Priority number, date | GB20130007199 | 22.04.2013 Original published format: GB 201307199 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014173827 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2988621 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A45D19/00 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
A45D19/018 (EP,GB,US);
A45D19/0066 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE HAARFÄRBEFOLIEN | [2016/09] | English: | IMPROVED HAIR COLOURING SHEETS | [2016/09] | French: | FEUILLES POUR COLORATION CAPILLAIRE AMÉLIORÉES | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 27.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 28.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1477082 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0077]; figures 1-17 * * paragraph [0060] *; | [Y]US5335679 (BAXTER MICHAEL J [US]) [Y] 3-8 * column 9, line 1 - column 12, line 31; figures 1-17 *; | [XP]WO2013093775 (OREAL [FR]) [XP] 1,2,9,10 * page 16, line 32 - page 17, line 2; figure 14 * | [XYI] - Renny White, "Water dissoluble paper & Dissolvable Produclts", (20090303), URL: http://www.extrapackaging.com/watersolublepaper/, (20140711), XP002727061 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 3-8 [I] 2 | Examination | GB2443386 |