|
18.04.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.04.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2016 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
27.09.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2016 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
01.06.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
01.06.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
15.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
16 |
|
10.04.2015 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
10.04.2015 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.02.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
20.02.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.02.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
19.02.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |