EP2971026 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BACTERIOCHLOROPHYLL A [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOOKAD IP SARL 7 Place du Théâtre 2613 Luxembourg / LU | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EREN, Doron Shikun Banim 7687000 Neta'im / IL | 02 /
MAZOR, Nitsa Kibbutz Sde Boker 8499300 / IL | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/47] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/03] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14718737.1 | 11.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014IB00468 | Priority number, date | US201361776314P | 11.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361776314 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014140786 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2971026 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2971026 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12P17/18 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C12P17/182 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (RU);
C12P17/165 (US);
C12P17/18 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BACTERIOCHLOROPHYLL A | [2020/09] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING BACTERIOCHLOROPHYLL A | [2016/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BACTERIOCHLOROPHYLLE A | [2020/09] |
Former [2016/03] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BAKTERIOCHLOROPHYLL A | ||
Former [2016/03] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BACTÉRIOCHLOROPHYLLES A | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 20.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 29.05.2020 | [2020/28] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.11.2020 | CY | 18.11.2020 | EE | 18.11.2020 | FI | 18.11.2020 | HR | 18.11.2020 | LT | 18.11.2020 | LV | 18.11.2020 | MK | 18.11.2020 | MT | 18.11.2020 | RS | 18.11.2020 | SI | 18.11.2020 | SK | 18.11.2020 | SM | 18.11.2020 | BG | 18.02.2021 | NO | 18.02.2021 | IS | 18.03.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MK | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 18.11.2020 | Cited in | by applicant | EP0863903 | US6147195 | US6333319 | US6569846 | WO2004045492 | US8207154 |