EP2970193 - PYRROLE AMIDE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Inc. 1 North Waukegan Road North Chicago, IL 60064 / US | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states AbbVie Inc. 1 North Waukegan Road North Chicago, IL 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASVOLD, Lisa, A. 552 Shakespeare Drive Grayslake, Illinois 60030 / US | 02 /
LIU, Dachun 1276 Georgetown Way Vernon Hills, Illinois 60061 / US | 03 /
PRATT, John, K. 8210 61st. Avenue Kenosha, Wisconsin 53142 / US | 04 /
SHEPPARD, George, S. 807 Locust Road Wilmette, Illinois 60091 / US | 05 /
MCDANIEL, Keith, F. 26029 W. Laurel Court Wauconda, Illinois 60084 / US | 06 /
ELMORE, Steven, W. 2139 Ash Lane Northbrook, Illinois 60062 / US | 07 /
HUBBARD, Robert, D. 7684 Marker Road San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Schlich, George William, et al Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/30] | Schlich, George, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | ||
Former [2016/03] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14718832.0 | 12.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US24508 | Priority number, date | US201361777749P | 12.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361777749 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014165127 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2970193 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2970193 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D401/10, C07D403/04, C07D403/10, C07D405/12, C07D407/12, C07D409/10, C07D409/12, C07D413/10, C07D471/04, C07D207/36, C07D403/12, A61K31/4439, A61K31/4704, A61K31/4725 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C07D207/34 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/16 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07D207/36 (EP,US);
C07D401/10 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/10 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D407/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/10 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | 23.09.2015 | ME | 23.09.2015 | Title | German: | PYRROLAMIDINHIBITOREN | [2016/03] | English: | PYRROLE AMIDE INHIBITORS | [2016/03] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE PYRROLE-AMIDE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 24.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/47] | 12.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/03] | 18.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Request for further processing for: | 12.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 12.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.2016 | Decision despatched | Loss of rights: Claims | 12.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 12.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2014 | AL | 25.07.2018 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | RS | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | PT | 25.11.2018 | IE | 12.03.2019 | LU | 12.03.2019 | MT | 12.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.03.2014 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
MT | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
MT | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
MT | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2008034600 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 119 - page 129; examples 129, 142a, 142b, 142c *; | [X]WO9802430 (PFIZER PHARMA [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 74 - page 77; compounds 43, 85, 93 *; | [XP]WO2013130660 (AMGEN INC [US]) [XP] 1-6,13,14,21 * pages 531-532; claims 1-50, 52; compound 417 *; | [X] - MARIA MENICHINCHERI ET AL, "Cdc7 kinase inhibitors: 5-heteroaryl-3-carboxamido-2-aryl pyrroles as potential antitumor agents. 1. Lead finding", vol. 53, no. 20, doi:10.1021/JM100504D, ISSN 0022-2623, (20100901), pages 7296 - 7315, JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, URL: http://pubs.acs.org/doi/abs/10.1021/jm100504d, (20100927), XP002619675 [X] 1-6 * page 7300; table 1; compounds 4-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JM100504D | [X] - TESTA M L ET AL, "A new entry to the substituted pyrrolo[3,2-c]quinoline derivatives of biological interest by intramolecular heteroannulation of internal imines", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040705), vol. 60, no. 28, doi:10.1016/J.TET.2004.05.047, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 5873 - 5880, XP004519798 [X] 1-7 * page 5874; compounds 2b, 3b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2004.05.047 | [X] - ANANDA HERATH ET AL, "One-Step Continuous Flow Synthesis of Highly Substituted Pyrrole-3-carboxylic Acid Derivatives via in Situ Hydrolysis of tert- Butyl Esters", ORGANIC LETTERS, (20101119), vol. 12, no. 22, doi:10.1021/ol102216x, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 5182 - 5185, XP055117166 [X] 1-3 * Table 5 Entries 1-4; page 5185 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol102216x | [X] - E. AIELLO ET AL, "New synthesis of condensed heterocycles from isoxazole derivatives VI. 2,5-Dimethyl-3-aeetyl-7-amino-1 H -pyrrolo[3,2-b] pyridine", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, (19780601), vol. 15, no. 4, doi:10.1002/jhet.5570150402, ISSN 0022-152X, pages 537 - 539, XP055117160 [X] 1-3 * page 538; compound 4a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570150402 | [X] - JOTI SARUP AGGARWAL ET AL, "STUDIES IN CHEMOTHERAPY: ATTEMPTS TO FIND ANTIMALARIALS. II. PYRRYL INDOLES", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19321001), vol. 54, no. 10, doi:10.1021/ja01349a025, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 3988 - 3992, XP055117161 [X] 1-3 * 5-phenyl-3-aceto-2-methyl-2-methylpyrrole; page 3989 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01349a025 | [X] - DATTOLO G ET AL, "Polycondensed nitrogen heterocycles. Part 15. Reactivity of 3-diazopyrroles. 3. 1H-Pyrrolo<3,2-c>cinnoline and pyrrolo<3,4-c>pyridazine", HETEROCYCLES,, (19840101), vol. 22(10), ISSN 0385-5417, pages 2269 - 2276, XP009177885 [X] 1-3 * page 2270; compound 2a * | [X] - KATO T ET AL, "Reaction of .beta.-aminocrotonamides with .alpha.-haloketones and .alpha.-hydroxyketones", HETEROCYCLES : AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL FOR REVIEWS AND COMMUNICATIONS IN HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, JAPAN INSTITUTE OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, JP, (19780101), vol. 10, no. Special Issue, ISSN 0385-5414, pages 261 - 264, XP009178881 [X] 1-5,7 * page 264; compound 6 * | [X] - "1H-Pyrrole-3-carboxamide, 2-methyl-5-(4-pyridinyl)-", REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20100829), Database accession no. 1248540-92-2, XP002726751 [X] 1-6 * Compound with Registry Number 1248540-92-2 * | [A] - PAUL BAMBOROUGH ET AL, "Fragment-Based Discovery of Bromodomain Inhibitors Part 2: Optimization of Phenylisoxazole Sulfonamides", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20120126), vol. 55, no. 2, doi:10.1021/jm201283q, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 587 - 596, XP055061954 [A] 1-21 * page 591; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm201283q | [A] - HEWINGS D S ET AL, "3,5-Dimethylisoxazoles Act As Acetyl-lysine-mimetic Bromodomain Ligands", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 54, no. 19, doi:10.1021/JM200640V, ISSN 0022-2623, (20111013), pages 6761 - 6770, (20110906), XP002689396 [A] 1-21 * page 6764; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm200640v | by applicant | WO2006129623 | - YANG ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2008), vol. 28, pages 967 - 976 | - LEROY ET AL., MOL. CELL, (2008), vol. 30, pages 51 - 60 | - ZUBER ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 478, pages 524 - 528 | - MERTZ ET AL., PROC. NAT'1. ACAD. SCI., (2011), vol. 108, pages 16669 - 16674 | - DELMORE ET AL., CELL, (2011), vol. 146, pages 1 - 14 | - DAWSON ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 478, pages 529 - 533 | - HUANG ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2009), vol. 29, pages 1375 - 1387 | - NICODEME ET AL., NATURE, (2010), vol. 468, pages 1119 - 1123 | - ZHANG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2012), vol. 287, pages 28840 - 28851 | - DENIS, DISCOVERY MEDICINE, (2010), vol. 10, pages 489 - 499 | - JANG ET AL., MOL. CELL, (2005), vol. 19, pages 523 - 534 | - BANERJEE ET AL., J.LEUKOCYTEBIOL. | - MATZUK ET AL., CELL, (2012), vol. 150, pages 673 - 684 | - S. M. BERGE ET AL., J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - N. MIYAMA; A. SUZUKI, CHEM. REV., (1995), vol. 95, pages 2457 - 2483 | - J. ORGANOMET. CHEM., (1999), vol. 576, pages 147 - 148 | - Methods in Cell Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1976), vol. XIV, page 33 | - V.R. SUTTON; D.L. VAUX; J.A. TRAPANI, J. OFIMMUNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 158, no. 12, page 5783 | - EASTWOOD ET AL., J BIOMOL SCREEN, (2006), vol. 11, pages 253 - 261 |