EP2971237 - AZOLE COMPOUNDS AS CORROSION INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRC-Desoto International, Inc. 12780 San Fernando Road Sylmar, California 91342 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRIS, Eric L. 30184 Mauroux Ct. Murrieta, California 92563 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2022/18] |
Former [2016/03] | f & e patent Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 14718844.5 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US26019 | Priority number, date | US201361802613P | 16.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361802613 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014151570 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2971237 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2971237 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/10, C08K5/34, C09D7/40, C23C22/56, C23C22/66, C23C22/68, C23F11/08, C23F11/14, C23F11/18, C23G1/22, C23G1/26, C09D5/08, C23G1/06 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
C23F11/149 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
C09D5/086 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C23C22/05 (KR);
C23C22/56 (CN,RU,US);
B05D7/14 (EP);
B05D7/16 (EP);
C09D163/00 (CN);
C09D175/04 (EP);
C09D5/08 (KR);
C09D5/4465 (EP);
C09D7/40 (EP,RU,US);
C23C22/66 (CN,KR,RU,US);
C23C22/68 (CN,KR,RU,US);
C23F11/08 (KR,RU,US);
C23F11/16 (CN);
C23F11/185 (KR,RU,US);
C23G1/061 (KR,US);
C23G1/063 (CN,KR,US);
C23G1/065 (CN);
C23G1/125 (CN);
C23G1/18 (CN);
C23G1/22 (CN,KR,US);
C23G1/26 (CN,KR,US);
C08K3/10 (EP,US);
C08K5/34 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | C23C22/56, C23C22/66, C23C22/68, C23F11/08, C23F11/14, C23F11/18, C23G1/22, C23G1/26, C23G1/06, C09D5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AZOLVERBINDUNGEN ALS KORROSIONSINHIBITOREN | [2016/03] | English: | AZOLE COMPOUNDS AS CORROSION INHIBITORS | [2016/03] | French: | COMPOSÉS D'AZOLE UTILISÉS EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE CORROSION | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 23.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22166116.8 / EP4039851 | EP22166119.2 / EP4039852 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.05.2022 | AT | 04.05.2022 | CZ | 04.05.2022 | DK | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | FI | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | PL | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | PT | 05.09.2022 | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3340001 (SPENCER THORNHILL RAYMOND); | [X]US4098720 (HWA CHIH M); | [X]US5567534 (YANO MASAMI [JP], et al); | [X]US5747439 (DUNN STEVEN [US], et al); | [X]US2004255819 (SINKO JOHN [US]); | [X]US2006091354 (VAN OOIJ WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [X]US2010151253 (ROTH MARCEL [DE], et al); | [XP]EP2570515 (DEFT INC [US]) | Examination | GB2255783 | EP2366743 |