EP2988694 - ROBOT, PARTICULARLY FOR MINI-INVASIVE SURGERY THROUGH A SINGLE PARIETAL INCISION OR NATURAL ORIFICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valuebiotech S.r.l. Piazza Ospedale Maggiore 3 20162 Milano / IT | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORGIONE, Antonello Via Vincenzo da Seregno 44 I-20161 Milano / IT | 02 /
JAUVTIS, Louis Judah Route Principale 38 2533 Evilard / CH | 03 /
ZALTIERI, Renzo Via Padre Giovanni Marengoni, 29 20060 Trezzano Rosa / IT | [2016/38] |
Former [2016/24] | 01 /
FORGIONE, Antonello Via Vincenzo da Seregno 44 I-20161 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
JAUVTIS, Louis Judah Bergstrasse 73 Safnern / CH | |||
03 /
ZALTIERI, Renzo Via Padre Giovanni Marengoni, 29 20060 Trezzano Rosa / IT | |||
Former [2016/09] | 01 /
FORGIONE, Antonello Via Vincenzo da Seregno 44 I-20161 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
JAUVTIS, Louis Judah Bergstrasse 73 Safnern / CH | |||
03 /
ZALTIERI, Renzo Via Verdi 3 I-20864 Agrate Brianza / IT | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [2020/18] |
Former [2016/09] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (IT) Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 14718985.6 | 23.04.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014EP58199 | Priority number, date | IT2013MI00666 | 23.04.2013 Original published format: IT MI20130666 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014173932 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2988694 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2988694 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, // A61B90/00, A61B90/35 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B1/00148 (US);
A61B1/00149 (US);
A61B1/0016 (US);
A61B90/35 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00362 (EP);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2931 (EP);
A61B2017/294 (EP);
A61B2034/302 (EP,US);
A61B2034/306 (EP,US);
A61B90/11 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/09] | A61B90/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBOTER, INSBESONDERE FÜR MINIMAL INVASIVE CHIRURGIE DURCH EINEN EINZIGEN PARIETALEN SCHNITT ODER EINE NATÜRLICHE ÖFFNUNG | [2016/09] | English: | ROBOT, PARTICULARLY FOR MINI-INVASIVE SURGERY THROUGH A SINGLE PARIETAL INCISION OR NATURAL ORIFICE | [2016/09] | French: | ROBOT, EN PARTICULIER POUR CHIRURGIE À EFFRACTION MINIMALE À TRAVERS UNE INCISION PARIÉTALE OU UN ORIFICE NATUREL UNIQUE | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 01.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2014 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | IT | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 23.04.2014 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MK | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 23.04.2014 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 23.04.2014 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002143319 (BROCK DAVID L [US]) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0058]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2009054909 (FARRITOR SHANE M [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0091]; figures 8-13 *; | [XI]US2011071508 (DUVAL EUGENE F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * paragraphs [0137] - [0139] - [0295]; figures 16,17,30 * [I] 3,5; | [XI]WO2013026012 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * paragraphs [0023] - [0025] - [0037]; figures 1,4,7 * [I] 3 |