EP2989084 - CRYSTAL MODIFICATIONS OF ELOBIXIBAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELOBIX AB Arvid Wallgrens Backe 20 413 46 Göteborg / SE | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOHLIN, Martin Kalmgatan 23 121 45 Johanneshov / SE | 02 /
TJERNELD, Erica Olympiavägen 90 122 40 Enskede / SE | 03 /
VESTERMARK, Andreas Snickerigatan 14 126 26 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
YMÉN, Ingvar Gundersbergsvägen 8 132 48 Saltsjö-boo / SE | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Novitas Patent AB P.O. Box 55557 102 04 Stockholm / SE | [2016/09] | Application number, filing date | 14719331.2 | 25.04.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014EP58432 | Priority number, date | SE20130050517 | 26.04.2013 Original published format: SE 1350517 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014174066 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2989084 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2989084 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D281/10, A61K31/554, A61P1/16 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
C07D281/10 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/554 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Extension states | BA | 06.11.2015 | ME | 06.11.2015 | Title | German: | KRISTALLMODIFIKATIONEN VON ELOBIXIBAT | [2016/09] | English: | CRYSTAL MODIFICATIONS OF ELOBIXIBAT | [2016/09] | French: | MODIFICATIONS CRISTALLINES D'ÉLOBIXIBAT | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 07.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2014 | AL | 25.01.2017 | CY | 25.01.2017 | CZ | 25.01.2017 | EE | 25.01.2017 | HR | 25.01.2017 | LT | 25.01.2017 | LV | 25.01.2017 | MC | 25.01.2017 | MK | 25.01.2017 | RO | 25.01.2017 | RS | 25.01.2017 | SI | 25.01.2017 | SK | 25.01.2017 | SM | 25.01.2017 | BG | 25.04.2017 | LU | 25.04.2017 | MT | 25.04.2017 | GR | 26.04.2017 | IS | 25.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 25.04.2014 | |
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MK | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
LU | 25.04.2017 | ||
MT | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 25.04.2014 | |
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
LU | 25.04.2017 | ||
MT | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.04.2014 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
LU | 25.04.2017 | ||
MT | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 25.01.2017 | |
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
LU | 25.04.2017 | ||
MT | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 25.01.2017 | |
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
LU | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 25.01.2017 | |
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 25.01.2017 | |
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 25.01.2017 | |
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 25.01.2017 | |
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | HR | 25.01.2017 | |
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO0250051 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) |