EP2970908 - THERAPEUTIC PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. 450 Brookline Avenue Boston, MA 02215-5450 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WUCHERPFENNIG, Kai, W. 67 Highland Road Brookline, MA 02445 / US | 02 /
DRANOFF, Glenn 150 Concord Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 03 /
HODI, F., Stephen 15 Vaillencourt Drive Framingham, MA 02115 / US | 04 /
FRANZ, Bettina 9 Sherman House Rustat Avenue Cambridge MA CB1 3RF / GB | 05 /
MAY, Kenneth, F. 106 Village Downtown Blvd. Bozeman, MT 59715 / US | 06 /
HARVEY, Christopher 8 Conway Street Boston, MA 02131 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14720000.0 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US29348 | Priority number, date | US201361792034P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361792034 P | US201361913198P | 06.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361913198 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014144791 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2970908 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2970908 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/12, C12N5/0783, A61K39/395, A61K35/14, C07K16/28, A61K39/00, A61K38/15, A61N5/10, A61K45/06, A61K35/17, C07K16/30 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
C07K16/2833 (EP,US);
A61K38/12 (EP,US);
A61K38/15 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (EP,US);
A61K39/4613 (EP);
A61K39/4644 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61N5/10 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/30 (US);
C07K16/3015 (US);
C07K16/3023 (US);
C07K16/3053 (US);
C07K16/3061 (US);
C07K16/3069 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K35/17 (US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/15, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2016/03] | C12N5/0783, A61K39/395, A61K35/14, C07K16/28, A61K39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | 07.10.2015 | ME | 07.10.2015 | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE PEPTIDE | [2016/03] | English: | THERAPEUTIC PEPTIDES | [2016/03] | French: | PEPTIDES THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 02.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 14.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19207376.5 / EP3666886 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.07.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 07.07.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2014 | AL | 25.12.2019 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | IE | 14.03.2020 | LU | 14.03.2020 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO2013049517 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]); | by applicant | EP0154316 | WO8807054 | WO8807089 | EP0401384 | US5122464 | US5225539 | WO9429351 | US5530101 | WO9632478 | US5585089 | US5591639 | US5624821 | US5648260 | US5658759 | WO9734631 | US5677425 | US5693762 | US5714350 | US5869046 | WO9951642 | WO9954342 | US5981216 | WO0042072 | US6121022 | US6165745 | US6180370 | US6194551 | WO0158957 | US6277375 | WO0206919 | EP1176195 | US6350861 | US2003022450 | WO03035835 | US2003153043 | WO03074679 | WO2004016750 | US2004067503 | WO2004029207 | WO2004035752 | US6737056 | WO2004063351 | WO2004074455 | WO2004099249 | WO2005040217 | WO2005070963 | WO2005092925 | WO2006020114 | US7317091 | US2010261269 | US8101720 |