EP2969671 - WIPER BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pylon Manufacturing Corp. 600 West Hillsboro Blvd. Suite 400 Deerfield Beach, FL 33441 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOLENTINO, Vambi, Raymundo 1921 Nw 35th Terrace Coconut Creek, FL 33066 / US | 02 /
PEERS, Robert, Peter 23157 Sw 56th Avenue Boca Raton, FL 33433 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14720008.3 | 17.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US30329 | Priority number, date | US201313840256 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313840256 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014145538 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2969671 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
B60S1/3801 (EP,RU,US);
B60S1/3874 (RU,US);
B60S1/3806 (EP,RU,US);
B60S2001/3815 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | WISCHERBLATT | [2016/03] | English: | WIPER BLADE | [2016/03] | French: | BALAI D'ESSUIE-GLACE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 09.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/04] | 20.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2019 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2437959 (SEV MARCHAL); | [X]DE4439275 (JOURNEE PAUL SA [FR]); | [X]EP0885791 (VALEO SYSTEMES DESSUYAGE [FR]); | [XI]US2007089257 (HARITA YASUHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2012180245 (KU YUAN-CHIN [TW]); | [XY]EP2532558 (YANG CHIH-MING [TW], et al); | [XP]WO2013126907 (PYLON MFG CORP [US]); | [XP]WO2013126910 (PYLON MFG CORP [US]) | by applicant | US6640380 | US6944905 | US7293321 | US7523520 |