EP2973511 - VIRTUAL REALITY GTAW AND PIPE WELDING SIMULATOR AND SETUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lincoln Global, Inc. 9160 Norwalk Boulevard Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670 / US | [2017/29] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Lincoln Global, Inc. 17721 Railroad Street City of Industry, CA 91748 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLACE, Matthew, Wayne 324 Deming Street South Windsor, CT 06074 / US | 02 /
ZBORAY, David, Anthony 34 Teeter Rock Road Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | 03 /
ADITJANDRA, Antonius 10263 Auburn Road Chardon, OH 44024 / US | 04 /
WEBB, Adam, Lee 3575 Center Road Perry, OH 44081 / US | 05 /
POSTLETHWAITE, Deanna 5929 Solstice Drive Sparks, Nevada 89436 / US | 06 /
LENKER, Zachary, Steven 300 South Street, Apt. F5 Vernon, CT 06066 / US | [2018/43] |
Former [2016/25] | 01 /
WALLACE, Matthew, Wayne 24 Red Stone Way Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
02 /
ZBORAY, David, Anthony 34 Teeter Rock Road Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | |||
03 /
ADITJANDRA, Antonius 564 Water Street, Apt 225D Chardon, OH 44024 / US | |||
04 /
WEBB, Adam, Lee 3575 Center Road Perry, OH 44081 / US | |||
05 /
POSTLETHWAITE, Deanna 5929 Solstice Drive Sparks, Nevada 89436 / US | |||
06 /
LENKER, Zachary, Steven 300 South Street, Apt. F5 Vernon, CT 06066 / US | |||
Former [2016/19] | 01 /
WALLACE, Matthew, Wayne 24 Red Stone Way Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
02 /
ZBORAY, David, Anthony 34 Teeter Rock Road Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | |||
03 /
ADITJANDRA, Antonius 564 Water Street, Apt 225D Chardon, OH 44024 / US | |||
04 /
WEBB, Adam, Lee 3575 Center Road Perry, OH 44081 / US | |||
05 /
POSTLETHWAITE, Deanna 423 Bell Street Chagrin Falls, OH 44022 / US | |||
06 /
LENKER, Zachary, Steven 300 South Street, Apt. F5 Vernon, CT 06066 / US | |||
Former [2016/15] | 01 /
WALLACE, Matthew, Wayne 24 Red Stone Way Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
02 /
ZBORAY, David, Anthony 34 Teeter Rock Road Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | |||
03 /
ADITJANDRA, Antonius 564 Water Street, Apt 225D Chardon, OH 44024 / US | |||
04 /
WEBB, Adam, Lee 3575 Center Road Perry, OH 44081 / US | |||
05 /
POSTLETHWAITE, Deanna 423 Bell Street Chargrin Falls, OH 44022 / US | |||
06 /
LENKER, Zachary, Steven 300 South Street, Apt. F5 Vernon, CT 06066 / US | |||
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
WALLACE, Matthew, Wayne c/o Lincoln Global Inc. 17721 Railroad Street City of Industry, CA 91748 / US | ||
02 /
ZBORAY, David, Anthony c/o Lincoln Global Inc. 17721 Railroad Street City of Industry, CA 91748 / US | |||
03 /
ADITJANDRA, Antonius c/o Lincoln Global Inc. 17721 Railroad Street City of Industry, CA 91748 / US | |||
04 /
WEBB, Adam, Lee c/o Lincoln Global Inc. 17721 Railroad Street City of Industry, CA 91748 / US | |||
05 /
POSTLETHWAITE, Deanna c/o Lincoln Global Inc. 17721 Railroad Street City of Industry, CA 91748 / US | |||
06 /
LENKER, Zachary, Steven c/o Lincoln Global Inc. 17721 Railroad Street City of Industry, CA 91748 / US | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schloss Schellenberg - Backhaus Renteilichtung 1 45134 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14720216.2 | 07.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014IB00259 | Priority number, date | US201313792294 | 11.03.2013 Original published format: US201313792294 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014140710 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2973511 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2973511 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/095, B23K9/10, B23K9/32, G09B19/24 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
B23K9/095 (EP,CN);
G09B9/00 (CN);
B23K9/1043 (EP,CN);
B23K9/321 (EP,CN);
G09B19/24 (EP,CN)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | G09B19/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | 12.10.2015 | ME | 12.10.2015 | Title | German: | AUF VIRTUELLER REALITÄT BASIERENDER GTAW- UND ROHRVERSCHWEISSUNGSSIMULATOR UND EINRICHTUNG | [2016/03] | English: | VIRTUAL REALITY GTAW AND PIPE WELDING SIMULATOR AND SETUP | [2016/03] | French: | SOUDAGE À L'ÉLECTRODE DE TUNGSTÈNE DE RÉALITÉ VIRTUELLE ET SIMULATEUR DE SOUDAGE DE TUYAU ET INSTALLATION | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 23.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2014 | AL | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | HR | 17.10.2018 | IT | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | MK | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | RS | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | SM | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | NO | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | GB | 07.03.2019 | IE | 07.03.2019 | LU | 07.03.2019 | MT | 07.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | FR | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 07.03.2014 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
GB | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
MT | 07.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
GB | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
MT | 07.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
GB | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
MT | 07.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
GB | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
GB | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | HR | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | HR | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | HR | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3866011 (COLE EDGAR C) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]US4359622 (DOSTOOMIAN ASHOD S, et al) [A] 1 * column 16, lines 47-53 *; | [Y]US2001052893 (JOLLY MARK R [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0055] *; | [Y]US2011183304 (WALLACE MATTHEW WAYNE [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0059]; figure 1 * |