EP2996573 - LOADING DEVICES FOR PERCUTANEOUS PERFORATION CLOSURE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/12] | LOADING DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PERCUTANEOUS PERFORATION CLOSURE SYSTEMS | ||
[2022/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivasure Medical Limited Parkmore Business Park West Galway / IE | [2018/43] |
Former [2016/12] | For all designated states Vivasure Medical Limited Unit 6 Dangan IDA Business Park Dangan, Galway / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANT, Peter 3 Dangan Court Dangan Galway / IE | 02 /
PAWLIKOWSKI, Bartosz Apt. 10 Cearnog Nua Moycullen Co. Galway / IE | 03 /
SLATTERY, Daniel 13 Caheronaun Park Loughrea Co. Galway / IE | 04 /
MURPHY, Matthew Pembrokestown House Pembrokestown Whiterock Hill Wexford / IE | 05 /
MARTIN, Chris Rusheeney Oughterard Co. Galway / IE | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Weldon O'Brien Ltd. Shannon Lodge Casement Road Bandon County Cork, P72 TN24 / IE | [2022/17] |
Former [2016/12] | O'Brien, John Augustine, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Third Floor, Duncairn House, 14 Carysfort Avenue Blackrock, Co Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 14720252.7 | 15.03.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014IB59848 | Priority number, date | US201361789584P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361789584 P | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014141209 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2996573 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2996573 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B50/33 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
B65B39/007 (US);
A61B50/33 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0053 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00597 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00623 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00637 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00654 (EP,US);
A61B2050/314 (EP,US);
A61B2090/036 (EP,US);
A61B2090/037 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/12] | A61B17/00, A61B50/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LADEVORRICHTUNGEN FÜR PERKUTANE PERFORATIONSVERSCHLUSSSYSTEME | [2022/02] | English: | LOADING DEVICES FOR PERCUTANEOUS PERFORATION CLOSURE SYSTEMS | [2022/02] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE RECHARGE POUR SYSTÈMES D'OCCLUSION DE PERFORATION PERCUTANÉE | [2022/02] |
Former [2016/12] | LADEVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR PERKUTANE PERFORATIONSVERSCHLUSSSYSTEME | ||
Former [2016/12] | LOADING DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PERCUTANEOUS PERFORATION CLOSURE SYSTEMS | ||
Former [2016/12] | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE CHARGEMENT POUR SYSTÈMES DE FERMETURE DE PERFORATION PERCUTANÉE | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 20.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.01.2022 | 22.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.04.2022 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | HR | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | NL | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | RS | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SI | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | SM | 27.04.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0761250 (TARGET THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,9,11-14 * figure 4 *; | [A]US5620461 (MUIJS VAN DE MOER WOUTER M [NL], et al) [A] 1* figure 8 *; | [X]US5997515 (DE LA TORRE ROGER A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,11,14 * figures 6a,7,23 *; | [X]US6200328 (CRAGG ANDREW H [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,11-14 * columns 5-8; figures 2,7,8,9,10 *; | [X]US2009012521 (AXELSON JR STUART L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-15 * paragraph [0024]; figures 1,4,9 *; | [X]DE102010048908 (AESCULAP AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7,11-14 * figures 1b,1c *; | [XP]WO2013128292 (VIVASURE MEDICAL LTD [IE]) [XP] 1,2,4,6-15 * paragraphs [0395] , [0400] , [0405] , [0406] , [0418] , [0435]; figures 36-43N,59 * |