03.04.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.08.2023 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
05.08.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
05.08.2023 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
04.08.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.05.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.11.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.09.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
03.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.07.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.02.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
12.04.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.10.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.09.2018 |
First examination report |
|
07.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
17.05.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
15.01.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
13.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
19.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|