EP2994523 - CHROMATOGRAPHIC PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HIGHLY PURIFIED POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groupe Novasep Site Eiffel Boulevard de la Moselle 54340 Pompey / FR | [2016/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALERY, Eric 8 grande rue F-54425 Saulxures les Nancy / FR | 02 /
ADAM, Philippe 42 rue de la Justice F-54320 Maxéville / FR | 03 /
BLEHAUT, Jean 58bis rue de Metz F-54000 Nancy / FR | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | August Debouzy 7, rue de Téhéran 75008 Paris / FR | [2024/08] |
Former [2016/11] | August & Debouzy avocats 6-8 avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 14720547.0 | 23.04.2014 | [2016/11] | WO2014EP58166 | Priority number, date | EP20130305596 | 07.05.2013 Original published format: EP 13305596 | US201361820459P | 07.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361820459 P | US201313897056 | 17.05.2013 Original published format: US201313897056 | US201414149420 | 07.01.2014 Original published format: US201414149420 | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014180654 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2994523 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2994523 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C11C1/08, B01D15/18 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
B01D15/185 (EP);
C11C1/08 (EP,GB);
B01D15/18 (GB);
B01D15/1892 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] |
Former [2016/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHROMATOGRAPHISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHREINEN, MEHRFACH UNGESÄTTIGTEN FETTSÄUREN | [2023/40] | English: | CHROMATOGRAPHIC PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HIGHLY PURIFIED POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS | [2016/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ CHROMATOGRAPHIQUE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ACIDES GRAS POLYINSATURÉS HAUTEMENT PURIFIÉS | [2016/11] |
Former [2016/11] | CHROMATOGRAFISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHREINEN, MEHRFACH UNGESÄTTIGTEN FETTSÄUREN | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 12.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 12.08.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 24.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 24.10.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.11.2016 | Decision despatched | 24.10.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.11.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
LV | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
PL | 21.02.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4189442 (LUBSEN TIMOTHY A [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [A]US4797233 (ZINNEN HERMANN A [US]) [A] 1-37 * column 10, line 25 - line 38 *; | [AD]US5719302 (PERRUT MICHEL [FR], et al) [AD] 1-37 * column 15, line 53 - line 66; figure 5b; example 2 *; | [YA]US2003222024 (HAMENDE MICHEL [BE], et al) [Y] 10-21,34-37 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-4 * [A] 1-9,22-33; | [A]US2005245405 (GEIER DOUGLAS F [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * figure 2 *; | [AD]WO2013005051 (BASF PHARMA CALLANISH LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-37* page 4, lines 31-33; page 15, lines 25-27 *; | [XYI] - YAMAMURA ET AL, "INDUSTRIAL HIGH-PERFORMANCE LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY PURIFICATION OF DOCOSAHEXAENOIC ACID ETHYL ESTER AND DOCOSAPENTAENOIC ACID ETHYL ESTER FRO MSINGLE-CELL OIL", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, SPRINGER, DE, (19970730), vol. 74, no. 11, doi:10.1007/S11746-997-0250-6, ISSN 0003-021X, pages 1435 - 1440, XP002166746 [X] 1-3,8,22-24,26,27,29,34,37 * page 1436, right column; scheme 3, scheme 4; page 1439, right column * [Y] 10-21,34-37 [I] 4-7,9,25,28,30-33,35,36 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11746-997-0250-6 | by applicant | EP0342629 | US5064539 | US5102553 | US5630943 | US5719302 | US6063284 | US6136198 | US6375839 | US6413419 | US6712973 | FR2889077 | US7479228 | US2011091947 | WO2011080503 | US8282831 | WO2013005048 | WO2013005051 | WO2013005052 | - KWANGNAM LEE, "Two Section Simulated Moving Bed Process", SEPARATION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 35, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1081/SS-100100173, pages 519 - 534, XP008015253 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/SS-100100173 | - ZHANG ET AL., JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (2003), vol. 1006, pages 87 - 99 |