EP2996856 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FOAM BODY BY MEANS OF AN EXTRUSION PROCESS, AND EXTRUSION DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A FOAM BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAN LÜCK, Frank Hauserhöfe 47a 47877 Willich / DE | For all designated states Gneuss GmbH Mönichhusen 42 32549 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | [2020/26] |
Former [2016/12] | For all designated states VAN LÜCK, Frank Grünstrasse 31 D-41564 Kaarst / DE | ||
For all designated states Gneuss GmbH Mönichhusen 42 32549 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN LÜCK, Frank Hauserhöfe 47a 47877 Willich / DE | [2017/33] |
Former [2016/12] | 01 /
VAN LÜCK, Frank Grünstrasse 31 D-41564 Kaarst / DE | Representative(s) | Abel, Martin Adelzreiterstraße 29 80337 München / DE | [2016/12] | Application number, filing date | 14720588.4 | 28.04.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014EP58634 | Priority number, date | DE20131008202 | 14.05.2013 Original published format: DE102013008202 | [2016/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014183985 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2996856 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2996856 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/24] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2996856 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/34, B29C48/38, B29C48/36, B29C48/42 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
B29C48/385 (EP,US);
B29B7/485 (EP,US);
B29B7/726 (EP,US);
B29B7/7466 (EP,US);
B29C44/3442 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C48/43 (EP,US);
B29C48/435 (EP,US);
B29C48/832 (EP,US);
B29C48/834 (EP,US);
B29C48/865 (EP,US);
B29B7/42 (EP,US);
B29B7/48 (EP,US);
B29B7/823 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US);
B29C48/29 (EP,US);
B29C48/38 (EP,US);
B29C48/87 (EP,US);
B29K2105/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/12] | B29C44/34, B29C47/36, B29C47/38, B29C47/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHAUMKÖRPERS DURCH EXTRUSION UND EXTRUSIONSVORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHAUMKÖRPERS | [2016/12] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FOAM BODY BY MEANS OF AN EXTRUSION PROCESS, AND EXTRUSION DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A FOAM BODY | [2016/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CORPS ALVÉOLAIRE PAR EXTRUSION ET DISPOSITIF D'EXTRUSION POUR FABRIQUER UN CORPS ALVÉOLAIRE | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 05.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.05.2020 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2014 | AL | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.04.2014 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MK | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 28.04.2014 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 28.04.2014 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2179886 (SEKISUI PLASTICS) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, line 18 - page 3, line 60; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5215764 (DAVIS MARTIN E [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,8 * column 1, lines 9 - 19 * * column 4, line 56 - column 7, line 31; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0694376 (SEKISUI PLASTICS [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4-9 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 34 *; | [Y]DE4431913 (GEFINEX JACKON GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, lines 1-12 * * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0818292 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * page 6, lines 25-46 * * page 9, line 52 - page 11, line 17 *; | [Y]US6062718 (FOGARTY JAMES D [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-9 * column 5, line 49 - column 9, line 45; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1230296 (L M P IMPIANTI S R L [IT]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] - [0021]; figures 1,7 *; | [Y]WO2008075941 (ROLLEPAAL B V [NL], et al) [Y] 1,2,8* page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 38 * | Examination | US3850414 | by applicant | WO03033240 | EP1434680 |