06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
03.06.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
25.06.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
25.06.2021 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
25.06.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
22.06.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.06.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.06.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.02.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
14.02.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.11.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
24.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.07.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.02.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.10.2019 |
First examination report |
|
14.10.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
31.05.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
05.02.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
04.12.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.12.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
06.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|