EP3057947 - MATERIALS FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2016/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIL, Holger Hallgartenstrasse 61 60389 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
RODRIGUEZ, Lara-lsabel Paedagogstrasse 2 64283 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
BURKHART, Beate Wilhelm-Leuschner-Strasse 13 64293 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
DARSY, Amandine Hansteinstrasse 2 60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/34] | Application number, filing date | 14721764.0 | 29.04.2014 | [2016/34] | WO2014EP01148 | Priority number, date | EP20130004921 | 14.10.2013 Original published format: EP 13004921 | [2016/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014111269 | Date: | 24.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3057947 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3057947 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/80, C07C255/52, C07D335/10, C07C2/08, C07D409/14, C07D209/82, C07C13/62, C07F7/02 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
C07C13/62 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/624 (EP,US);
C07C1/30 (US);
C07C13/72 (US);
C07C17/206 (US);
C07C17/263 (EP,US);
C07C209/10 (US);
C07C211/61 (EP,US);
C07C22/08 (EP,US);
C07C25/22 (EP,US);
C07C253/14 (US);
C07C255/51 (US);
C07C255/52 (EP,KR,US);
C07D209/80 (EP,US);
C07D209/82 (EP,US);
C07D209/86 (EP,US);
C07D213/06 (EP,US);
C07D307/77 (EP,US);
C07D307/91 (EP,US);
C07D311/78 (EP,US);
C07D311/80 (EP,US);
C07D335/10 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07F5/025 (EP,US);
C07F7/0807 (US);
C07F7/081 (EP,US);
C07F7/083 (US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/00 (KR);
H10K85/40 (US);
H10K85/626 (US);
H10K85/633 (EP,US);
H10K85/636 (US);
H10K85/654 (US);
H10K85/6572 (EP,US);
H10K85/6574 (EP,US);
C07C2602/08 (EP,US);
C07C2603/18 (EP,US);
C07C2603/54 (EP,US);
C07C2603/94 (EP,US);
C07C2603/97 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1007 (US);
C09K2211/1011 (US);
C09K2211/1014 (US);
C09K2211/1022 (US);
C09K2211/1029 (US);
C09K2211/1088 (US);
C09K2211/1096 (US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K50/15 (EP,US);
H10K85/657 (US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/263, C07C22/08 (US,EP);
C07C17/263, C07C25/22 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATERIALIEN FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2016/34] | English: | MATERIALS FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICES | [2016/34] | French: | MATÉRIAUX POUR DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2016/34] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/34] | 04.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2014 | AL | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | ES | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | HR | 17.10.2018 | IT | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | MK | 17.10.2018 | MT | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | RS | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | SM | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | NO | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | AT | 29.04.2019 | GB | 29.04.2019 | IE | 29.04.2019 | LU | 29.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | FR | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 29.04.2014 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
MT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
AT | 29.04.2019 | ||
GB | 29.04.2019 | ||
IE | 29.04.2019 | ||
LU | 29.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 29.04.2014 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
AT | 29.04.2019 | ||
GB | 29.04.2019 | ||
IE | 29.04.2019 | ||
LU | 29.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
AT | 29.04.2019 | ||
GB | 29.04.2019 | ||
IE | 29.04.2019 | ||
LU | 29.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
AT | 29.04.2019 | ||
GB | 29.04.2019 | ||
IE | 29.04.2019 | ||
LU | 29.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
GB | 29.04.2019 | ||
IE | 29.04.2019 | ||
LU | 29.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
GB | 29.04.2019 | ||
LU | 29.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
GB | 29.04.2019 | ||
LU | 29.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 29.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI] - COCHEREL, NICOLAS ET AL, "New 3.pi.-2spiro ladder-type phenylene materials: synthesis, physicochemical properties and applications in OLEDs", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (2008), vol. 14, no. 36, doi:10.1002/CHEM.200801428, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 11328 - 11342, XP002729016 [X] 1-17 * Schemata;; example -; table -; compound - * [I] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.200801428 | [XI] - PORIEL, CYRIL ET AL, "Incorporation of Spiroxanthene Units in Blue-Emitting Oligophenylene Frameworks: A New Molecular Design for OLED Applications", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (2011), vol. 17, no. 45, doi:10.1002/CHEM.201100790, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 12631 - 12645, XP002729017 [X] 1-17 * Schemata;; example -; claim -; table -; compound - * [I] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.201100790 | [XI] - JIANG, ZUOQUAN ET AL, "Bent ladder-type hexaphenylene with carbazole core and spiro linkage as stable and efficient blue emitter", ORGANIC LETTERS, (2009), vol. 11, no. 18, doi:10.1021/OL901635V, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 4132 - 4135, XP002729018 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * [I] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol901635v | [XI] - KIM, BOK YEONG ET AL, "Substituted carbazole-based organic light compound as an electroluminescent material or/and electron/hole transport material for organic light device", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2012:893981, URL: STN, XP002684350 [X] 1-17 * abstract * [I] 1-17 | [XI] - WANG, CHANGSHENG ET AL, "Synthesis, characterization, and OFET and OLED properties of .pi.-extended ladder-type heteroacenes based on indolodibenzothiophene", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2012:350021, URL: STN, XP002729020 [X] 1-17 * abstract * [I] 1-17 |