EP2999767 - PHOSPHORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2016/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETRY, Ralf Kinzigweg 14 64347 Griesheim / DE | 02 /
WINKLER, Holger Lily-Pringsheim-Weg 17 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
JUESTEL, Thomas Auf dem Kamp 7C 58455 Witten / DE | 04 /
MUELLER, Matthias Dortmunder Strasse 39 48155 Muenster / DE | [2016/13] | Application number, filing date | 14721768.1 | 30.04.2014 | [2016/13] | WO2014EP01162 | Priority number, date | EP20130002693 | 23.05.2013 Original published format: EP 13002693 | [2016/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014187530 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2999767 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/77, H05B33/14 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
H01L33/502 (EP,US);
C09K11/77342 (EP,US);
C09D5/22 (EP,US);
C09K11/57 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Title | German: | LEUCHTSTOFFE | [2016/13] | English: | PHOSPHORS | [2016/13] | French: | SUBSTANCE LUMINESCENTE | [2016/13] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 17.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 28.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102006037730 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]DE102007022566 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * claim 6 *; | [A]DE102007056342 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-6 *; | [Y] - SHANSHAN YAO ET AL, "Preparation and luminescent properties of BaCaSiO:Eu", OPTICS AND LASER TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 43, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.OPTLASTEC.2011.03.024, ISSN 0030-3992, (20110314), pages 1282 - 1285, (20110318), XP028384707 [Y] 1-15 * Absatz 1. und 2.1.;; table 1 * * page 1283, column 2, lines 61-64 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.optlastec.2011.03.024 | [Y] - PARK K ET AL, "Temperature and excitation power-resistant white-light emission of the T-phase (Ba,Ca)2SiO4:Eu<2+>,Mn<2+> phosphor", SOLID STATE COMMUNICATIONS, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 150, no. 7-8, doi:10.1016/J.SSC.2009.11.025, ISSN 0038-1098, (20090922), pages 329 - 332, (20091122), XP026893437 [Y] 1-15 * page 329 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ssc.2009.11.025 | [A] - HYUN JU LEE ET AL, "Optical Properties of Blue-Light-Emitting (Ca,Sr)Mg2Si3O9:Eu2+ Phosphor", vol. 49, no. 10, doi:10.1143/JJAP.49.102101, ISSN 0021-4922, (20101020), pages 102101 - 1, JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JP, URL: http://jjap.jsap.jp/link?JJAP/49/102101/, XP001558747 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.49.102101 | Examination | - KIM ET AL, "Luminescent and thermal properties of full-color emitting X3MgSi2O8:Eu<2+>, Mn<2+> (X=Ba, Sr, Ca) phosphors for white LED", JOURNAL OF LUMINESCENCE, ELSEVIER BV NORTH-HOLLAND, NL, (20061206), vol. 122-123, doi:10.1016/J.JLUMIN.2006.01.231, ISSN 0022-2313, pages 583 - 586, XP005768019 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jlumin.2006.01.231 | by applicant | WO9110715 | JPH04304290 | WO9927033 | US2007298250 | WO2009065480 | WO2010075908 | - JAPANESE J. OF APPL. PHYS., (2005), vol. 44, no. 21, pages L649 - L651 |