EP2988772 - COMPLEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSL Ltd. 45 Poplar Road Parkville VIC 3052 / AU | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
METZNER, Hubert Im Boden 6 35041 Marburg / DE | 02 /
SCHULTE, Stefan Bauerbacher Strasse 46 35043 Marburg / DE | 03 /
WEIMER, Thomas Richard-Wagner-Strasse 8 35075 Gladenbach / DE | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Peter, Beate, et al CSL Behring GmbH Patents & Licenses Emil-von-Behring-Straße 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2016/09] | Application number, filing date | 14722135.2 | 22.04.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014EP58093 | Priority number, date | EP20130164728 | 22.04.2013 Original published format: EP 13164728 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014173873 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2988772 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/37, A61K47/48, C07K14/755, A61P7/04 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
A61K38/37 (EP,US);
A61K38/36 (EP,US);
A61K47/55 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61K47/62 (EP,US);
A61K47/64 (US);
A61K47/65 (US);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C07K14/755 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Title | German: | KOMPLEX | [2016/09] | English: | COMPLEX | [2016/09] | French: | COMPLEXE | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 27.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/28] | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US4970300 (FULTON ANNE J [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,11,12,25-28,30-33,35-38 * column 4, lines 23-33 column 12, lines 4-6 column 4, lines 33-44;; claims 1-5, 7, 9 *; | [X]US6037452 (MINAMINO HITOSHI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11,19,25-27,30,31,35-38 * column 7, lines 47-54 column 1, lines 25-34 column 7, lines 60-64 column 1, lines 5-10 column 3, lines 15-27;; example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2006071801 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11,12,25-28,30-33,35-38 * paragraphs [0008] , [00 9] , [0014] , [0 16] , [0 18] , [0 19] , [0 22] - [0027] - [0 29] - [0033] - [0040] - [0043]; example 38; claims 1, 2,5, 6, 7, 8, 28 *; | [X]WO2009156137 (CSL BEHRING GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,11,19,25,27-29,31,35-38 * page 10, paragraph 4 page 26, line 3-page 27, line 19;; examples 1, 7; claims 1-4, 13,19,23-25, 29, 20,21 *; | [X]US2012316116 (SCHEIFLINGER FRIEDRICH [AT], et al) [X] 1,2,11,19,25,27,28,30,32,35-38 * paragraphs [0036] , [0037] , [ 147] , [ 164] , [ 169] - [0171] - [ 178] , [ 194]; examples 1, 3-5; claims 1, 3 *; | [XPI]WO2013106787 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US]) [XP] 1-4,11,12,16,18-20,24-33,35-38 * figures 2,4; example 4; claims 1, 4, 5, 17, 20, 21, 24, 25, 26 *[I] 1-38 | Examination | WO2014011819 | by applicant | US4970300 | EP0503991 | WO9415625 | WO9703193 | WO9711957 | EP0784632 | WO9740145 | WO9955306 | WO02060951 | WO02103024 | WO03035861 | WO03087355 | WO03093313 | WO2004067566 | WO2004075923 | WO2004101740 | WO2006053299 | WO2006071801 | WO2006108590 | WO2007090584 | WO2007126808 | WO2008077616 | WO2009156137 | WO2011060242 | WO2013083858 | WO2013106787 | WO2014011819 | - LEYTE ET AL., BIOCHEM J, (1989), vol. 257, pages 679 - 683 | - COLLINS ET AL., PROC NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 4393 - 4397 | - FISCHER ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1994), vol. 351, pages 345 - 348 | - ZHOU ET AL., BLOOD, (2012), vol. 120, no. 2, pages 449 - 458 | - SCHNEPPENHEIM; BUDDE, J THROMBOSIS HAEMOSTASIS, (2011), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 209 - 215 | - ZHOU ET AL., BLOOD, (2012), vol. 120, pages 449 - 458 | - FEDERICI AB ET AL., HAEMATOLOGICA, (2004), vol. 89, pages 77 - 85 | - SUCKER ET AL., CLIN APPL THROMB HEMOST., (2006), vol. 12, pages 305 - 310 | - KALLAS; TALPSEP, ANNALS OF HEMATOLOGY, (2001), vol. 80, pages 466 - 471 | - KAUFMAN, TRANSFUSION MED. REVS., (1992), vol. 6, page 235 | - AMANO, THROMB. HAEMOST., (1998), vol. 79, pages 557 - 563 | - SWAROOP ET AL., JBC, (1997), vol. 272, pages 24121 - 24124 | - LOLLAR, THROMB. HAEMOST., (1999), vol. 82, pages 505 - 508 | - OH ET AL., EXP. MOL. MED., (1999), vol. 31, pages 95 - 100 | - ANANYEVA ET AL., TCM, (2001), vol. 11, pages 251 - 257 | - GALE ET AL., J. THROMB. HEMOST., (2006), vol. 4, pages 1315 - 1322 | - MIAO ET AL., BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, pages 3412 - 3419 | - WAKABAYASHI ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 44, pages 10298 - 304 | - PIPE, SEM. THROMB. HEMOST., (2004), vol. 30, pages 227 - 237 | - S. ROSEN, SCAND J HAEMATOL, (1984), vol. 33, pages 139 - 145 | - DEVEREUX ET AL., NUCL ACIDS RES, (1984), vol. 12, page 387 | - LIPMAN; PEARSON, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 227, pages 1436 - 1441 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - THOMPSON ET AL., NUCL ACIDS RES, (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC. | - TATEWAKI ET AL., THROMB. RES., (1988), vol. 52, pages 23 - 32 | - METZNER ET AL., HAEMOPHILIA, (1998), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 25 - 32 | - MCCUE ET AL., J. CHROM. A, (2009), vol. 1216, no. 45, pages 7824 - 30 |