|
09.06.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.06.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
157 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
157 |
|
12.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2021 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2020 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.02.2019 |
Communication from Examining division including search results r.164(2)(b) EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2019 |
Search results under rule 164(2)(b) EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Communication from the examining division with an Invitation to pay a search fee(s) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.01.2015 |
Published international application - A4 |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.2014 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
171 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
100 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
180 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
115 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
112 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
160 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
101 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
53 |