EP2992314 - METHOD FOR CHARACTERISING A PRODUCT BY TOPOLOGICAL SPECTRAL ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/10] | METHOD FOR CHARACTERISING A PRODUCT BY MEANS OF TOPOLOGICAL SPECTRAL ANALYSIS | ||
[2019/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Topnir Systems SAS Parc de la Duranne 13100 Aix en Provence / FR | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERT, Didier 2 Chemin de Bacourey F-33430 Bernos Beaulac / FR | 02 /
SAINT MARTIN, Claude La Poterie Chemin des hirondelles F-13330 Pelissane / FR | 03 /
SANCHEZ, Miguel 2 Avenue des Pervenches F-13117 Lavera / FR | 04 /
RIBERO, Bernard Chemin de Pierrefiche Peyrolles en Provence 13660 / FR | [2020/21] |
Former [2016/10] | 01 /
LAMBERT, Didier 2 Chemin de Bacourey F-33430 Bernos Beaulac / FR | ||
02 /
SAINT MARTIN, Claude La Poterie Chemin des hirondelles F-13330 Pelissane / FR | |||
03 /
SANCHEZ, Miguel 2 Avenue des Pervenches F-13117Lavera / FR | |||
04 /
RIBERO, Bernard Chemin de Pierrefiche Peyrolles en Provence 13660 / FR | Representative(s) | De Kezel, Eric, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | De Kezel, Eric, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 14722618.7 | 25.04.2014 | [2016/10] | WO2014EP58495 | Priority number, date | EP20130290098 | 30.04.2013 Original published format: EP 13290098 | [2016/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014177471 | Date: | 06.11.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2992314 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2992314 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/359 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
G01N21/359 (EP,US);
G01N2201/129 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/10] | G01N21/35 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHARAKTERISIERUNGSVERFAHREN EINES PRODUKTS DURCH TOPOLOGISCHE SPEKTRALANALYSE | [2019/45] | English: | METHOD FOR CHARACTERISING A PRODUCT BY TOPOLOGICAL SPECTRAL ANALYSIS | [2019/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE CARACTERISATION D'UN PRODUIT PAR ANALYSE SPECTRALE TOPOLOGIQUE | [2016/10] |
Former [2016/10] | VERFAHREN ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG EINES PRODUKTES MITTELS TOPOLOGISCHER SPEKTRALANALYSE | ||
Former [2016/10] | METHOD FOR CHARACTERISING A PRODUCT BY MEANS OF TOPOLOGICAL SPECTRAL ANALYSIS | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 23.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2014 | AL | 20.05.2020 | AT | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | CZ | 20.05.2020 | DK | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | ES | 20.05.2020 | FI | 20.05.2020 | HR | 20.05.2020 | IT | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | MK | 20.05.2020 | MT | 20.05.2020 | NL | 20.05.2020 | PL | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | RS | 20.05.2020 | SE | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | SM | 20.05.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | NO | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | PT | 21.09.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.04.2014 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
MK | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 25.04.2014 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 25.04.2014 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9207326 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [AD] 2* claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0742900 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-14 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0015] *; | [A]WO2006126978 (SAUDI ARABIAN OIL CO [SA], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 15 * |