EP2986174 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN ITEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/08] | ITEM AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
[2022/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Löster, Harry Hermelinstr. 22/4 73434 Aalen / DE | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2016/08] | Application number, filing date | 14723002.3 | 15.04.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014EP57580 | Priority number, date | DE201310206639 | 15.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013206639 | [2016/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014170305 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2986174 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2986174 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A41D27/08, A45C1/02, B29C65/48, A45C3/02, // B29L31/48, B29C65/02, B29C65/50, B29L31/00, B29L9/00 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
A41D27/08 (EP,US);
A45C3/02 (EP,US);
G09F19/12 (US);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/48 (EP,US);
B29C65/5057 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/4724 (EP,US);
B29C66/723 (EP,US);
B29C66/729 (EP,US);
B29C66/7484 (EP,US);
B29C66/91411 (EP,US);
B29C66/919 (EP,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/48 (EP,US);
B29L2031/742 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/08] | A41D27/08, A45C1/02, B29C65/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ARTIKELS | [2022/25] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN ITEM | [2022/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE | [2022/25] |
Former [2016/08] | ARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN | ||
Former [2016/08] | ITEM AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
Former [2016/08] | ARTICLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 06.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.10.2022 | CZ | 12.10.2022 | DK | 12.10.2022 | EE | 12.10.2022 | FI | 12.10.2022 | HR | 12.10.2022 | LT | 12.10.2022 | LV | 12.10.2022 | MC | 12.10.2022 | NL | 12.10.2022 | PL | 12.10.2022 | RO | 12.10.2022 | RS | 12.10.2022 | SE | 12.10.2022 | SI | 12.10.2022 | SK | 12.10.2022 | SM | 12.10.2022 | NO | 12.01.2023 | GR | 13.01.2023 | IS | 12.02.2023 | PT | 13.02.2023 | IE | 15.04.2023 | LU | 15.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 12.10.2022 | |
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 12.10.2022 | |
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 12.10.2022 | |
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | FI | 12.10.2022 | |
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 12.10.2022 | |
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 12.10.2022 | |
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 12.10.2022 | |
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 12.10.2022 | |
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 12.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9624490 (LENTICULAR PLASTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 10, line 17 - page 22, line 12; figures 1-14 *; | [A]WO2006108060 (APPARITION MEDIA LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]US2006250695 (WELCH STEPHEN R [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2730785 | US2006250696 | US2009153959 | DE202009002186U | DE102010009906 |