Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11315579 | ![]() | 26.04.2022 | B2 | US2019378524 | 12.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201916546972 | 21.08.2019 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201715436182 | 17.02.2017 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10453463 | ![]() | 22.10.2019 | B2 | US2017229134 | 10.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201715436182 | 17.02.2017 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102163613B | ![]() | 08.10.2020 | B1 | KR20200016416 | 14.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | WO2014US32079 | 27.03.2014 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102077308B | ![]() | 14.02.2020 | B1 | KR20190010729 | 30.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | WO2014US32079 | 27.03.2014 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101942913B | ![]() | 28.01.2019 | B1 | KR20170090512 | 07.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | WO2014US32079 | 27.03.2014 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101763313B | ![]() | 14.08.2017 | B1 | KR20150122759 | 02.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | WO2014US32079 | 27.03.2014 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3364412 | ![]() | 01.09.2021 | B1 | EP3364412 | 22.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | WO2014US32079 | 27.03.2014 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | EP14723227 | 27.03.2014 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109509477B | ![]() | 04.08.2023 | B | CN109509477 | 22.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | WO2014US32079 | 27.03.2014 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | CN201811478583 | 27.03.2014 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | CN201480018639 | 27.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109473114B | ![]() | 29.09.2023 | B | CN109473114 | 15.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | WO2014US32079 | 27.03.2014 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | CN201811478584 | 27.03.2014 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | CN201480018639 | 27.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105144289B | ![]() | 04.12.2018 | B | CN105144289 | 09.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | WO2014US32079 | 27.03.2014 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014241174B | ![]() | 11.05.2017 | B2 | AU2014241174 | 01.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | WO2014US32079 | 27.03.2014 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2956937 | ![]() | 13.06.2018 | B1 | EP2956937 | 23.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | WO2014US32079 | 27.03.2014 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2687044T | 23.10.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | WO2014US32079 | 27.03.2014 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1215488 | 26.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | WO2014US32079 | 27.03.2014 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014160895 | ![]() | 02.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9607624 | ![]() | 28.03.2017 | B2 | US2014297291 | 02.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1257290 | 18.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI562131B | 11.12.2016 | B | TW201503108 | 16.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361891687 | 16.10.2013 | US201361806628 | 29.03.2013 | US201414226596 | 26.03.2014 | US201361857966 | 24.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | EP3364412 |