Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2981247 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2014248455 CA2907566 CN201480019667 EP14723543 JP2016505482 KR20157027064 US2014025660W US201514870736 US201715650437



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017312258Global Dossier 02.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201715650437 14.07.2017
US201361874146 05.09.2013
US201361807063 01.04.2013
US201514870736 30.09.2015
WO2014US25660 13.03.2014
US201461925400 09.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9737518Global Dossier 22.08.2017B2
US2016120855 05.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201361874146 05.09.2013
US201361807063 01.04.2013
US201514870736 30.09.2015
WO2014US25660 13.03.2014
US201461925400 09.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20150135328Global Dossier 02.12.2015A
Priority number Date
US201361874146 05.09.2013
US201361807063 01.04.2013
WO2014US25660 13.03.2014
US201461925400 09.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6473738BGlobal Dossier 20.02.2019B2
JP2016515576 30.05.2016A
Priority number Date
US201361874146 05.09.2013
US201361807063 01.04.2013
WO2014US25660 13.03.2014
US201461925400 09.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105324106Global Dossier 10.02.2016A
Priority number Date
US201361874146 05.09.2013
US201361807063 01.04.2013
WO2014US25660 13.03.2014
US201461925400 09.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2907566Global Dossier 22.08.2023C
CA2907566 09.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361874146 05.09.2013
US201361807063 01.04.2013
WO2014US25660 13.03.2014
US201461925400 09.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2014248455BGlobal Dossier 06.12.2018B2
AU2014248455 15.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201361874146 05.09.2013
US201361807063 01.04.2013
WO2014US25660 13.03.2014
US201461925400 09.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2981247Global Dossier 07.06.2023B1
EP2981247 10.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201361874146 05.09.2013
US201361807063 01.04.2013
WO2014US25660 13.03.2014
US201461925400 09.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112015025160 18.07.2017A2
Priority number Date
US201361874146 05.09.2013
US201361807063 01.04.2013
WO2014US25660 13.03.2014
US201461925400 09.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1221175 26.05.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201361874146 05.09.2013
US201361807063 01.04.2013
WO2014US25660 13.03.2014
US201461925400 09.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2015013845 09.05.2016A
Priority number Date
US201361874146 05.09.2013
US201361807063 01.04.2013
WO2014US25660 13.03.2014
US201461925400 09.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2015146871 05.03.2018A3
RU2015146871 10.05.2017A
Priority number Date
US201361874146 05.09.2013
US201361807063 01.04.2013
WO2014US25660 13.03.2014
US201461925400 09.01.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014165303Global Dossier 09.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361874146 05.09.2013
US201361807063 01.04.2013
US201461925400 09.01.2014