EP3003623 - A SHEAR AND METHOD OF DETERMINING BLADE GAP IN A SHEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/15] | A SHEAR | ||
[2017/48] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primetals Technologies, Limited 21 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2DY / GB | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARTWRIGHT, Michael 21 Bruce Crescent Doncaster DN2 5JL / GB | 02 /
WOOTTON, Peter 20 Oakhill Road Dronfield S18 2EJ / GB | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Metals@Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14724672.2 | 06.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014EP59190 | Priority number, date | GB20130009859 | 03.06.2013 Original published format: GB 201309859 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014195071 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3003623 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23D35/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
B23D15/08 (EP,US);
B23D35/005 (GB,US);
B23D15/04 (GB,US);
B23D35/002 (EP,US);
B26D7/2628 (GB);
G01B21/16 (US);
G05B15/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | SCHERE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN DER MESSERSPALTE EINER SCHERE | [2018/15] | English: | A SHEAR AND METHOD OF DETERMINING BLADE GAP IN A SHEAR | [2017/48] | French: | CISAILLES ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE L'ESPACE INTERLAMES DE CISAILLES | [2017/48] |
Former [2016/15] | SCHERE | ||
Former [2016/15] | A SHEAR | ||
Former [2016/15] | CISAILLE | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 15.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 03.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB999188 (SCHLOEMANN AG) [A] 1-11 * figures 1, 2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2442547 (BEHRENS AG C) [A] 1-15* page 7, paragraph l - page 8, paragraph 1; figure 3 *; | [XI]GB1432475 (KH I AVTOMATIKI) [X] 1,4-11 * page 4, column l, line 12 - page 5, column l, line 30; figures 1,2 * [I] 2,3; | [A]FR2651456 (UGINE ACIERS [FR]) [A] 1-12 * figure 1; claims 1-3 * |