Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3143791
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.01.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
21.10.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.08.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] |
06.07.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.05.2019 |
First examination report |
|
11.05.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.07.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
26.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
17.02.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
17.02.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
21.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.10.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.10.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
28.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|