Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015172844 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP60098 | 16.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017086077 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP60098 | 16.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170005858 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP60098 | 16.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017520972 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP60098 | 16.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106465140 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP60098 | 16.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3143791 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP60098 | 16.05.2014 |