EP3007936 - PROTECTIVE DEVICE FOR ARRANGING IN THE FRONT-END OR REAR-END REGION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, COMPRISING AN UNDERBODY MADE OF FIBER-REINFORCED PLASTIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [2016/31] |
Former [2016/16] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Technische Universität Dresden Helmholtzstr. 10 01069 Dresden / DE | |||
For all designated states Leichtbau-Zentrum Sachsen GmbH Marschnerstrasse 39 01307 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATBERG, Lothar Friesenstr. 35 47445 Moers / DE | 02 /
MAYER, Stefan Am Kieküm 3 58239 Schwerte / DE | 03 /
KRAHNERT, Torsten Trift 6a 14554 Seddin / DE | 04 /
HUFENBACH, Werner Weißenberger Straße 1b 01324 Dresden / DE | 05 /
LADUSCH, Enrico Klingenbergerstr. 15 01187 Dresden / DE | 06 /
WERNER, Jens Röntgenstr. 2 01640 Coswig / DE | 07 /
KIESSLING, André Alfred-Schrapel-Str. 7 01307 Dresden / DE | 08 /
HERBIG, Alexander Grundstr. 134 01324 Dresden / DE | 09 /
KIELE, Jörn Martin-Luther-Platz 2 01099 Dresden / DE | 10 /
LEPPER, Martin Kipsdorfer Straße 149 01279 Dresden / DE | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2017/41] |
Former [2016/16] | ThyssenKrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14725206.8 | 21.05.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014EP60473 | Priority number, date | DE201310106080 | 12.06.2013 Original published format: DE102013106080 | [2016/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014198508 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3007936 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3007936 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/08, B62D35/02 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
B62D35/02 (EP,US);
B62D21/15 (US);
B60R13/0861 (EP,US);
B62D25/2072 (US);
B62D29/041 (US);
Y02T10/82 (EP,US);
Y02T10/88 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG ZUR ANORDNUNG IM VORDER- ODER HINTERWAGENBEREICH EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES, MIT EINEM UNTERBODEN AUS FASERVERSTÄRKTEM KUNSTSTOFF | [2016/16] | English: | PROTECTIVE DEVICE FOR ARRANGING IN THE FRONT-END OR REAR-END REGION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, COMPRISING AN UNDERBODY MADE OF FIBER-REINFORCED PLASTIC | [2016/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DESTINÉ À ÊTRE PLACÉ DANS LA ZONE AVANT OU ARRIÈRE D'UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR, POURVU D'UN FOND DE CAISSE EN PLASTIQUE RENFORCÉ PAR DES FIBRES | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 15.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2014 | AL | 11.10.2017 | CY | 11.10.2017 | DK | 11.10.2017 | EE | 11.10.2017 | FI | 11.10.2017 | HR | 11.10.2017 | IT | 11.10.2017 | LT | 11.10.2017 | LV | 11.10.2017 | MC | 11.10.2017 | MK | 11.10.2017 | MT | 11.10.2017 | NL | 11.10.2017 | RO | 11.10.2017 | RS | 11.10.2017 | SI | 11.10.2017 | SK | 11.10.2017 | SM | 11.10.2017 | TR | 11.10.2017 | BG | 11.01.2018 | NO | 11.01.2018 | GR | 12.01.2018 | IS | 11.02.2018 | GB | 21.05.2018 | IE | 21.05.2018 | LU | 21.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
CY | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MK | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
GB | 21.05.2018 | ||
IE | 21.05.2018 | ||
LU | 21.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
GB | 21.05.2018 | ||
IE | 21.05.2018 | ||
LU | 21.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | DK | 11.10.2017 | |
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
GB | 21.05.2018 | ||
IE | 21.05.2018 | ||
LU | 21.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | DK | 11.10.2017 | |
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
GB | 21.05.2018 | ||
IE | 21.05.2018 | ||
LU | 21.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | DK | 11.10.2017 | |
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
GB | 21.05.2018 | ||
IE | 21.05.2018 | ||
LU | 21.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | DK | 11.10.2017 | |
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 21.05.2018 | ||
LU | 21.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | DK | 11.10.2017 | |
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
LU | 21.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | DK | 11.10.2017 | |
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | DK | 11.10.2017 | |
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | DK | 11.10.2017 | |
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 11.10.2017 | |
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | DK | 11.10.2017 | |
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | DK | 11.10.2017 | |
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | DK | 11.10.2017 | |
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 11.10.2017 | |
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 11.10.2017 | |
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 11.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19613446 (CARBIKE LEICHTFAHRZEUGE GMBH & [DE]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 23 - column 7, line 35; figure - *; | [A]DE102007021216 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 4* paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0024]; figure - *; | [X]DE102010054694 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0067]; figure - * |