EP2986796 - DEVICE FOR HOLDING A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR IN AN AJAR POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exsto Thermoplastics 55 Avenue de la Déportation 26100 Romans Sur Isère / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | For all designated states Exsto Thermoplastics 55 Avenue de la Déportation 26100 Romans Sur Isere / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOYART, Eloi 6 rue de la Poterie F-26270 Loriol / FR | 02 /
BOURGEOIS, Olivier 101 Allée de Pré Noyet F-38730 Le Pin / FR | 03 /
PRETOT, Sébastien Quartier Machefer F-38840 Saint Hilaire du Rosier / FR | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2016/08] | Application number, filing date | 14725225.8 | 16.04.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014FR50925 | Priority number, date | FR20130053431 | 16.04.2013 Original published format: FR 1353431 | FR20130055362 | 11.06.2013 Original published format: FR 1355362 | [2016/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014170605 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986796 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2986796 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E05C21/00 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
E05C21/005 (EP,US);
B62D65/026 (US);
B05B13/0292 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM HALTEN EINER KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜR IN EINER HALBOFFENEN POSITION | [2016/08] | English: | DEVICE FOR HOLDING A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR IN AN AJAR POSITION | [2016/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR MAINTENIR UNE PORTIÈRE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE DANS UNE POSITION ENTREBÂILLÉE | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 01.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.11.2018 | AT | 21.11.2018 | CY | 21.11.2018 | DK | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | FI | 21.11.2018 | HR | 21.11.2018 | IT | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | MK | 21.11.2018 | MT | 21.11.2018 | NL | 21.11.2018 | RO | 21.11.2018 | RS | 21.11.2018 | SI | 21.11.2018 | SM | 21.11.2018 | BG | 21.02.2019 | NO | 21.02.2019 | GR | 22.02.2019 | IS | 21.03.2019 | PT | 21.03.2019 | IE | 16.04.2019 | LU | 16.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
MT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 16.04.2019 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 16.04.2019 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 16.04.2019 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | |
NO | 21.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE202004012900U (PRO TECH BERATUNGS & ENTWICKLUNGS GMBH [AT]) [A] 1,16* figure - *; | [AD]WO2006018193 (PRO TECH BERATUNGS & ENTWICKLUNGS GMBH [AT], et al) [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [XAI]FR2889227 (EXSTO THERMOPLASTIQUES SOC PAR [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-14,19 * figure - * [A] 9,17 [I] 16,20; | [X]FR2892140 (EXSTO SOC PAR ACTIONS SIMPLIFI [FR]) [X] 1,15,20 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]FR2893969 (EXSTO SOC PAR ACTIONS SIMPLIFI [FR]) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [XA]FR2926102 (BOULAY PLASTIQUES SA [FR]) [X] 1-7,10 * figure - * [A] 8 | by applicant | WO2006018193 |