EP3007956 - VEHICLE STEERING WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | [2016/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOINARD, Fabrice 3 rue du stade F-86170 Vouzailles / FR | 02 /
CASSIN, Sébastien 36 rue du Centre Louneuil F-86130 Jaunay Clan / FR | 03 /
BASQUE, Pierre 20 Bis rue Jean Moulin F-86380 Marigny Brizay / FR | 04 /
BOUHET, Pascal 20 route de Chabournay F-86380 Vendeuvre du Poitou / FR | 05 /
HESRY, Guillaume 41 avenue Jean Macé F-33700 Merignac / FR | [2017/07] |
Former [2016/16] | 01 /
MOINARD, Fabrice 3 rue du stade F-86170 Vouzailles / FR | ||
02 /
CASSIN, Sébastien 4 Boulevard Bajon F-86000 Poitiers / FR | |||
03 /
BASQUE, Pierre 20 Bis rue Jean Moulin F-86380 Marigny Brizay / FR | |||
04 /
BOUHET, Pascal 20 route de Chabournay F-86380 Vendeuvre du Poitou / FR | |||
05 /
HESRY, Guillaume 41 avenue Jean Macé F-33700 Merignac / FR | Representative(s) | Poindron, Cyrille, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [2016/16] | Application number, filing date | 14725427.0 | 20.05.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014EP60275 | Priority number, date | FR20130001386 | 14.06.2013 Original published format: FR 1301386 | [2016/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014198499 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3007956 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3007956 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/06, B62D1/11, B62D1/04 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
B62D1/046 (EP,US);
B62D1/11 (US);
B62D1/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/16] | B62D1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLENKRAD | [2016/16] | English: | VEHICLE STEERING WHEEL | [2016/16] | French: | VOLANT DE VEHICULE | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 01.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.11.2017
23.11.2017
ADMISSIBLE Joyson Safety Systems Aschaffenburg GmbH Bahnweg 1 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE Opponent's representative Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2023/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.11.2017
23.11.2017
ADMISSIBLE TB DEU Abwicklungs-Aktiengesellschaft Bahnweg 1 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE Opponent's representative Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2017/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.11.2017
ADMISSIBLE Takata AG Bahnweg 1 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE Opponent's representative Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | 15.12.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.04.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2019 | 03.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 23.05.2024 | Appeal received No. T0745/24 | 23.05.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 25.07.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2014 | AL | 15.02.2017 | AT | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | DK | 15.02.2017 | EE | 15.02.2017 | ES | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | HR | 15.02.2017 | IT | 15.02.2017 | LT | 15.02.2017 | LV | 15.02.2017 | MC | 15.02.2017 | MK | 15.02.2017 | MT | 15.02.2017 | NL | 15.02.2017 | PL | 15.02.2017 | RO | 15.02.2017 | RS | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | SM | 15.02.2017 | TR | 15.02.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | NO | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | IE | 20.05.2017 | LU | 20.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | IS | 15.06.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | GB | 20.05.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 20.05.2014 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
TR | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
GB | 20.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 20.05.2014 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
GB | 20.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 20.05.2014 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
GB | 20.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.05.2014 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
GB | 20.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
GB | 20.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0184618 (SIEMENS PRODUCTION & LOGISTICS [DE], et al) [A] 1,6-9 * page 3, line 34 - page 5, line 2 ** figure - *; | [A]WO2009030497 (TAKATA PETRI AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,11,12 * page 14, line 20 - page 15, line 16 * * page 19, line 19 - page 20, line 8 * * figure - *; | [A]DE102008036161 (DAIMLER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0017] - [0021] * * figure - * | Opposition | US5560264 | JP2001280507 | WO0184618 | JP2002225725 | DE10227943 | DE202004012304U | DE10325097 | DE102005003414 | EP1764533 | JP2009012744 | WO2009030497 | DE102008019246 | DE102008036161 | WO2011129747 | EP1649725 | EP2511154 | - "Dichtungen", Prof. Ing. Joachim Pokorny et al, Maschinenteile Teil 1, (19920000), pages 349 - 355, ISBN 3519063417, XP055439724 |