EP3008314 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN AVERAGE SEGMENT TIME OF AN ENCODER WHEEL OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTER, Michael Unterer Klingelbrunnen 49 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | 02 /
BISCHOFF, Bjoern Alt-Wuerttemberg-Allee Nr.8 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | 03 /
PALMER, Joachim Ludwigsburger Str. 62 70825 Korntal-Muenchingen / DE | 04 /
BOLLINGER, Stefan Ulrichstrasse 41 71672 Marbach Am Neckar / DE | [2016/16] | Application number, filing date | 14725478.3 | 22.05.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014EP60518 | Priority number, date | DE201310210741 | 10.06.2013 Original published format: DE102013210741 | [2016/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014198509 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3008314 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02D41/24, F02D41/10, F02D41/12 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
F02D41/2429 (EP,US);
G01P3/44 (US);
F02D41/0097 (EP,US);
F02D41/1497 (EP,US);
F02D41/26 (EP,US);
G01P3/487 (EP,US);
F02D2200/101 (EP,US);
F02D41/12 (EP,US);
F02D41/123 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER MITTLEREN SEGMENTZEIT EINES GEBERRADS EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2016/16] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN AVERAGE SEGMENT TIME OF AN ENCODER WHEEL OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2016/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UN TEMPS SEGMENTAIRE MOYEN D'UNE ROUE ÉMETTRICE D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 24.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 16.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0177692 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1* page 4, line 1 - line 6; figure 1 *; | [IY]US6363318 (WANG YUE YUN [US], et al) [I] 1,2 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 9; figure 5 * [Y] 3,5; | [IY]DE102004015038 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 1,2,4,6-9 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007]; figures 1, 6 * * paragraph [0030] * [Y] 3,5; | [I]DE102010009648 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] *; | [IY]JP2011220164 (DENSO CORP) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0009]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053] * [Y] 3 | Examination | DE3604904 |