EP3003674 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A CONNECTION ELEMENT, A CONNECTION ELEMENT ACCORDING TO THE PROCESS, A MOLD FOR REALISING THE PROCESS AND A CONNECTION SYSTEM WITH SUCH A CONNECTION ELEMENT, [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/15] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONNECTING PART, CONNECTING PART PRODUCED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE METHOD, TOOL FOR PRODUCING SUCH A CONNECTING PART AND FASTENING SYSTEM HAVING SUCH A CONNECTING PART | ||
[2017/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gottlieb Binder GmbH & Co. KG Bahnhofstrasse 19 71088 Holzgerlingen / DE | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POULAKIS, Konstantinos, Dr. Hohenzollernstrasse 7 71157 Hildrizhausen / DE | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/15] |
Former [2016/15] | Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur Patentanwälte Bartels und Partner Lange Straße 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 14725641.6 | 20.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014EP01356 | Priority number, date | DE20131009091 | 28.05.2013 Original published format: DE102013009091 | [2016/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014191088 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3003674 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3003674 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/00, B29C45/14, B29L31/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
B29C45/0025 (EP,US);
B29C45/26 (US);
A44B13/0052 (US);
A44B18/0076 (US);
A44B18/008 (US);
B29C44/1271 (US);
B29C45/14786 (US);
B60N3/046 (US);
F16B11/006 (US);
B29K2077/00 (US);
B29K2079/08 (US);
B29K2101/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES VERBINDUNGSTEILS, NACH DEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTES VERBINDUNGSTEIL, WERKZEUG ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES SOLCHEN VERBINDUNGSTEILS UND BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINEM DERARTIGEN VERBINDUNGSTEIL | [2016/15] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A CONNECTION ELEMENT, A CONNECTION ELEMENT ACCORDING TO THE PROCESS, A MOLD FOR REALISING THE PROCESS AND A CONNECTION SYSTEM WITH SUCH A CONNECTION ELEMENT, | [2017/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION UN ÉLÉMENT CONNEXION, UN TEL ÉLÉMENT CONNEXION, UN MOULE POUR REALISER LEQUEL PROCÉCÉ ET UNE SYSTÈME DE CONNEXION UTILISE UN TEL ÉLÉMENT CONNEXION, | [2017/26] |
Former [2016/15] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONNECTING PART, CONNECTING PART PRODUCED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE METHOD, TOOL FOR PRODUCING SUCH A CONNECTING PART AND FASTENING SYSTEM HAVING SUCH A CONNECTING PART | ||
Former [2016/15] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT D'ASSEMBLAGE, ÉLÉMENT D'ASSEMBLAGE FABRIQUÉ SELON LEDIT PROCÉDÉ, OUTIL DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT D'ASSEMBLAGE DE CE TYPE, ET SYSTÈME DE FIXATION COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT D'ASSEMBLAGE DE CE TYPE | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 26.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2014 | AL | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | IE | 20.05.2020 | LU | 20.05.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.05.2014 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
LU | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0246221 (KUMPF WALTER) [A] 1,3,10,19 * page 1, column 2, line 45, paragraph 11 - line 53; figures 1,2 ** paragraph [0017] *; | [I]US4842916 (OGAWA KUNIHIKO [JP], et al) [I] 1-21 * column 4, lines 5-8,18,19,37,45,46; figures 1-11 *; | [A]EP0465983 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1,10,14,19 * paragraphs [0002] , [0018]; figures 3,5 *; | [Y]EP1481603 (YKK CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-21 * paragraphs [0027] , [0 30] , [0 33] , [0 37]; figures 7,8 *; | [Y]US2005189811 (HERRMANN CHARLES [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 41]; figures 7,13,14 * * paragraph [0033] *; | [A]US2008169388 (TORIGOE SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0005] , [0029] , [0030] , [0044] , [0056]; figures 1-3,8 *; | [X]DE102009054896 (DOMA AUTOZUBEHOER UND INDUSTRIEBEDARF GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 11] , [0045] , [ 103] , [0106] , [0115] , [0127] , [ 134]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0012] , [0047] *; | [X]DE102011104886 (BINDER GOTTLIEB GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0011]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0023] , [0024] , [0028] * | Examination | US5058245 | WO9219119 | JPH05211910 | DE9412527U | US2002112324 | WO2009103260 | US2014130333 |