EP2999369 - AN ITEM OF FOOTWEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FITFLOP LIMITED Eighth Floor 6 New Street Square London EC4A 3AQ / GB | [2021/03] |
Former [2016/45] | For all designated states FITFLOP LIMITED Eighth Floor 6 New Street Square London EC4A 3AQ / GB | ||
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Name Drop sarl 13, rue Edward Steichen 2540 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANN, Kevin 360 Wheatley Lane Road Fence Burnley, Lancashire BB12 9QA / GB | 02 /
FLECK, Robert c/o MSK Bio-Engineering Limited 1 Lyndhurst Avenue Low Fell Gateshead, Tyne & Wear NE9 6AY / GB | [2021/26] |
Former [2016/13] | 01 /
BANN, Kevin 360 Wheatley Lane Road Fence Burnley Lancashire BB12 9QA / GB | ||
02 /
FLECK, Robert c/o MSK Bio-Engineering Limited 1 Lyndhurst Avenue Low Fell Gateshead Tyne & Wear NE9 6AY / GB | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/26] |
Former [2016/13] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14725694.5 | 21.05.2014 | [2016/13] | WO2014EP60463 | Priority number, date | GB20130009164 | 21.05.2013 Original published format: GB 201309164 | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014187868 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2999369 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2999369 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/14, A43B13/18, A43B13/12 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
A43B7/141 (EP,US);
A43B13/38 (GB);
A43B7/28 (US);
A43B13/125 (US);
A43B13/127 (EP,US);
A43B13/146 (GB);
A43B13/187 (US);
A43B13/188 (EP,US);
A43B7/142 (EP,US);
A43B7/1425 (EP,US);
A43B7/143 (EP,US);
A43B7/1435 (EP,US);
A43B7/144 (EP,GB,US);
A43B7/1445 (EP,US);
A43B7/145 (EP,US);
A43B7/1485 (GB)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUHARTIKEL | [2016/13] | English: | AN ITEM OF FOOTWEAR | [2016/13] | French: | CHAUSSURE | [2016/13] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 17.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 11.02.2021 | [2021/23] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2014 | AL | 30.06.2021 | AT | 30.06.2021 | CY | 30.06.2021 | CZ | 30.06.2021 | DK | 30.06.2021 | EE | 30.06.2021 | ES | 30.06.2021 | FI | 30.06.2021 | HR | 30.06.2021 | IT | 30.06.2021 | LT | 30.06.2021 | LV | 30.06.2021 | MC | 30.06.2021 | MK | 30.06.2021 | MT | 30.06.2021 | NL | 30.06.2021 | PL | 30.06.2021 | RO | 30.06.2021 | RS | 30.06.2021 | SE | 30.06.2021 | SI | 30.06.2021 | SK | 30.06.2021 | SM | 30.06.2021 | BG | 30.09.2021 | NO | 30.09.2021 | GR | 01.10.2021 | IS | 30.10.2021 | PT | 02.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
MK | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/19] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 30.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1800129U (SCHALLER JOHANNES [DE]) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]US4003146 (MEIER ERNST, et al) [X] 1* figure - *; | [X]CH607677 (MEIER ERNST [CH]) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]EP0995364 (ASTRA S A S DI MARCOCCI GIUSEP [IT]) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]DE202007008016U (ZIMMERMANN MANUELA [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]GB2451739 (SCHERING PLOUGH HEALTHCARE [US]) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]WO2009067643 (SPENCO MEDICAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [XI]GB2493036 (NAME DROP SARL [LU]) [X] 1,3-6,8-10,13,14 * page 3, line 14 - line 16; figure - * * page 3, line 18 - line 19 * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 8 * [I] 2,7,11,12,15 |