Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019189125 | ![]() | 20.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47947709 | 05.06.2009 | US201916273924 | 12.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019095050 | ![]() | 28.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201313913428 | 08.06.2013 | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | US201261657744 | 09.06.2012 | US201816200281 | 26.11.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016359629 | ![]() | 08.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615064406 | 08.03.2016 | US201514725912 | 29.05.2015 | US201562171995 | 05.06.2015 | US201514725891 | 29.05.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015222517 | ![]() | 06.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015149920 | ![]() | 28.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68321810 | 06.01.2010 | US201113032614 | 22.02.2011 | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | US201514604186 | 23.01.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015040007 | ![]() | 05.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113175581 | 01.07.2011 | US68321810 | 06.01.2010 | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | US201414517579 | 17.10.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014365913 | ![]() | 11.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | US68321810 | 06.01.2010 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201261727554 | 16.11.2012 | US201361832841 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | US201361793924 | 15.03.2013 | US201113175581 | 01.07.2011 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201113161339 | 15.06.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201113032614 | 22.02.2011 | US201313913428 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | US201261657744 | 09.06.2012 | US20731608 | 09.09.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014365895 | ![]() | 11.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68321810 | 06.01.2010 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201261727554 | 16.11.2012 | US201361832841 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | US201361793924 | 15.03.2013 | US201113175581 | 01.07.2011 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201113161339 | 15.06.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201113032614 | 22.02.2011 | US201313913428 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | US201261657744 | 09.06.2012 | US201414291688 | 30.05.2014 | US20731608 | 09.09.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014365505 | ![]() | 11.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361832850 | 08.06.2013 | US201314081850 | 15.11.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014365459 | ![]() | 11.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361832850 | 08.06.2013 | US201314081843 | 15.11.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014365126 | ![]() | 11.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201314081915 | 15.11.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014365124 | ![]() | 11.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201314081902 | 15.11.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014365120 | ![]() | 11.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201314081896 | 15.11.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014279723 | ![]() | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313843796 | 15.03.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014278072 | ![]() | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361793924 | 15.03.2013 | US201414209815 | 13.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014278070 | ![]() | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081899 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014278051 | ![]() | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081895 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014208252 | ![]() | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113175581 | 01.07.2011 | US68321810 | 06.01.2010 | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | US201414224830 | 25.03.2014 | US201314039557 | 27.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014208224 | ![]() | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113175581 | 01.07.2011 | US68321810 | 06.01.2010 | US201414226705 | 26.03.2014 | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | US201314039557 | 27.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014208223 | ![]() | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113175581 | 01.07.2011 | US68321810 | 06.01.2010 | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | US201414222302 | 21.03.2014 | US201314039557 | 27.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014143424 | ![]() | 22.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261727554 | 16.11.2012 | US201313888232 | 06.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014108303 | ![]() | 17.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US51829206 | 08.09.2006 | US71532405 | 08.09.2005 | US201314141261 | 26.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014033059 | ![]() | 30.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113175581 | 01.07.2011 | US68321810 | 06.01.2010 | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | US201314039557 | 27.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013275899 | ![]() | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201313913428 | 08.06.2013 | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | US201261657744 | 09.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013185081 | ![]() | 18.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201313784707 | 04.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013185074 | ![]() | 18.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213725481 | 21.12.2012 | US201213725550 | 21.12.2012 | US201213725512 | 21.12.2012 | US201213725742 | 21.12.2012 | US201213725656 | 21.12.2012 | US201213725761 | 21.12.2012 | US51829206 | 08.09.2006 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201213725713 | 21.12.2012 | US201313784707 | 04.03.2013 | US201213725616 | 21.12.2012 | US201313784694 | 04.03.2013 | US18641409 | 12.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013117022 | ![]() | 09.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213725481 | 21.12.2012 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013111487 | ![]() | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201213725616 | 21.12.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013111348 | ![]() | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201213725656 | 21.12.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013110520 | ![]() | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201213725742 | 21.12.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013110519 | ![]() | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US51829206 | 08.09.2006 | US201213725481 | 21.12.2012 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201213725550 | 21.12.2012 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201213725713 | 21.12.2012 | US201213725616 | 21.12.2012 | US201213725512 | 21.12.2012 | US201213725742 | 21.12.2012 | US201213725656 | 21.12.2012 | US201213725761 | 21.12.2012 | US18641409 | 12.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013110518 | ![]() | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201213725512 | 21.12.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013110515 | ![]() | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201213725713 | 21.12.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013110505 | ![]() | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US51829206 | 08.09.2006 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201213725761 | 21.12.2012 | US18641409 | 12.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012311585 | ![]() | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012309363 | ![]() | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012265528 | ![]() | 18.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US47947709 | 05.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012245944 | ![]() | 27.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201213492809 | 09.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012016678 | ![]() | 19.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011265003 | ![]() | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113175581 | 01.07.2011 | US68321810 | 06.01.2010 | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011246891 | ![]() | 06.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68321810 | 06.01.2010 | US201113161339 | 15.06.2011 | US201113032614 | 22.02.2011 | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011145863 | ![]() | 16.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68321810 | 06.01.2010 | US201113032614 | 22.02.2011 | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010293462 | ![]() | 18.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68321810 | 06.01.2010 | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010064053 | ![]() | 11.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20731608 | 09.09.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009284476 | ![]() | 19.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007100790 | ![]() | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US51829206 | 08.09.2006 | US71532405 | 08.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12231318 | ![]() | 18.02.2025 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | US202217650589 | 10.02.2022 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | US201815898092 | 15.02.2018 | US201916405221 | 07.05.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12165635 | ![]() | 10.12.2024 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201615394162 | 29.12.2016 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201213492809 | 09.06.2012 | US202016879643 | 20.05.2020 | US202217732011 | 28.04.2022 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12113641 | ![]() | 08.10.2024 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201615180046 | 12.06.2016 | US202117184178 | 24.02.2021 | US201562199892 | 31.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12087308 | ![]() | 10.09.2024 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201916352410 | 13.03.2019 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | US201261657736 | 08.06.2012 | US202016912278 | 25.06.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11934961 | ![]() | 19.03.2024 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201313843796 | 15.03.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US202016747698 | 21.01.2020 | US201615085994 | 30.03.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11928604 | ![]() | 12.03.2024 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US51829206 | 08.09.2006 | US201916379048 | 09.04.2019 | US71532405 | 08.09.2005 | US201615299264 | 20.10.2016 | US201314141261 | 26.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11874128 | ![]() | 16.01.2024 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US202016864004 | 30.04.2020 | US201715825996 | 29.11.2017 | US201314081915 | 15.11.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11841986 | ![]() | 12.12.2023 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US202016894583 | 05.06.2020 | US201462057714 | 30.09.2014 | US201514856252 | 16.09.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11831770 | ![]() | 28.11.2023 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201615064406 | 08.03.2016 | US201562171995 | 05.06.2015 | US201816105464 | 20.08.2018 | US202117326127 | 20.05.2021 | US201715618707 | 09.06.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11692840 | ![]() | 04.07.2023 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | US201815971458 | 04.05.2018 | US202117191576 | 03.03.2021 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11506497 | ![]() | 22.11.2022 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201715494163 | 21.04.2017 | US201916511729 | 15.07.2019 | US201314081899 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11423886 | ![]() | 23.08.2022 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201615394162 | 29.12.2016 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201213492809 | 09.06.2012 | US202016879643 | 20.05.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11388280 | ![]() | 12.07.2022 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201916407590 | 09.05.2019 | US201514863069 | 23.09.2015 | US202117327204 | 21.05.2021 | US201562111100 | 02.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11385603 | ![]() | 12.07.2022 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201916594473 | 07.10.2019 | US201462057727 | 30.09.2014 | US201514856228 | 16.09.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11350253 | ![]() | 31.05.2022 | B2 | US2019014450 | 10.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816036730 | 16.07.2018 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201213729597 | 28.12.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11283703 | ![]() | 22.03.2022 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | US201815898092 | 15.02.2018 | US201916405221 | 07.05.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11120372 | ![]() | 14.09.2021 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US202016895944 | 08.06.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11080012 | ![]() | 03.08.2021 | B2 | US2017161018 | 08.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | US201261709766 | 04.10.2012 | US47947709 | 05.06.2009 | US201314046871 | 04.10.2013 | US201715417069 | 26.01.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11019193 | ![]() | 25.05.2021 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US201916407590 | 09.05.2019 | US201514863069 | 23.09.2015 | US201562111100 | 02.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11018862 | ![]() | 25.05.2021 | B2 | US2019068371 | 28.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615064406 | 08.03.2016 | US201562171995 | 05.06.2015 | US201816105464 | 20.08.2018 | US201715618707 | 09.06.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11002558 | ![]() | 11.05.2021 | B2 | US2018253148 | 06.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | US201815971458 | 04.05.2018 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10985937 | ![]() | 20.04.2021 | B2 | US2017033944 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615180046 | 12.06.2016 | US201514725912 | 29.05.2015 | US201514725891 | 29.05.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | US201562199892 | 31.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10951592 | ![]() | 16.03.2021 | B2 | US2019028445 | 24.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715400386 | 06.01.2017 | US201816141655 | 25.09.2018 | US201662276809 | 08.01.2016 | US201662348989 | 12.06.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10795541 | ![]() | 06.10.2020 | B2 | US2017083179 | 23.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201261647440 | 15.05.2012 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US47947709 | 05.06.2009 | US201313894354 | 14.05.2013 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | US201615193971 | 27.06.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10769217 | ![]() | 08.09.2020 | B2 | US2018276300 | 27.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815985847 | 22.05.2018 | US201361832850 | 08.06.2013 | US201314081850 | 15.11.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10741185 | ![]() | 11.08.2020 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201916352410 | 13.03.2019 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | US201261657736 | 08.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10719122 | ![]() | 21.07.2020 | B2 | US2016091871 | 31.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514725912 | 29.05.2015 | US201462057714 | 30.09.2014 | US201314081895 | 15.11.2013 | US201514725891 | 29.05.2015 | US201514856252 | 16.09.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10718627 | ![]() | 21.07.2020 | B2 | US2018238704 | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201715843611 | 15.12.2017 | US201314081902 | 15.11.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10706841 | ![]() | 07.07.2020 | B2 | US2017178626 | 22.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615394162 | 29.12.2016 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201213492809 | 09.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10706373 | ![]() | 07.07.2020 | B2 | US2012311584 | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10705794 | ![]() | 07.07.2020 | B2 | US2013275875 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | US201261657744 | 09.06.2012 | US201313913421 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10679605 | ![]() | 09.06.2020 | B2 | US2013275138 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | US201313913423 | 08.06.2013 | US201261657744 | 09.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10677606 | ![]() | 09.06.2020 | B2 | US2018238703 | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201715825996 | 29.11.2017 | US201314081915 | 15.11.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10655979 | ![]() | 19.05.2020 | B2 | US2014365125 | 11.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201314081911 | 15.11.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10630647 | ![]() | 21.04.2020 | B2 | US2017201499 | 13.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514725912 | 29.05.2015 | US201514725891 | 29.05.2015 | US201715400386 | 06.01.2017 | US201662276809 | 08.01.2016 | US201662348989 | 12.06.2016 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10579939 | ![]() | 03.03.2020 | B2 | US2016212229 | 21.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313843796 | 15.03.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201615085994 | 30.03.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10571873 | ![]() | 25.02.2020 | B2 | US2016091879 | 31.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514856279 | 16.09.2015 | US201514725912 | 29.05.2015 | US201462057738 | 30.09.2014 | US201314081895 | 15.11.2013 | US201514725891 | 29.05.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10553209 | ![]() | 04.02.2020 | B2 | US2014195252 | 10.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201414210183 | 13.03.2014 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | US201361798600 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10541885 | ![]() | 21.01.2020 | B2 | US2018041403 | 08.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261727554 | 16.11.2012 | US201715785184 | 16.10.2017 | US201313888232 | 06.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10540976 | ![]() | 21.01.2020 | B2 | US2010312547 | 09.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47947709 | 05.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10496753 | ![]() | 03.12.2019 | B2 | US2012022872 | 26.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10496050 | ![]() | 03.12.2019 | B2 | US2016091872 | 31.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514725912 | 29.05.2015 | US201462057727 | 30.09.2014 | US201514856228 | 16.09.2015 | US201314081895 | 15.11.2013 | US201514725891 | 29.05.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10475446 | ![]() | 12.11.2019 | B2 | US2014297284 | 02.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414303413 | 12.06.2014 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US47947709 | 05.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10454783 | ![]() | 22.10.2019 | B2 | US2015350031 | 03.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | US201514725912 | 29.05.2015 | US201462005764 | 30.05.2014 | US201462094391 | 19.12.2014 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10425284 | ![]() | 24.09.2019 | B2 | US2016226713 | 04.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68321810 | 06.01.2010 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201261727554 | 16.11.2012 | US201562111100 | 02.02.2015 | US201361832841 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | US201361793924 | 15.03.2013 | US201113175581 | 01.07.2011 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US201113161339 | 15.06.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201113032614 | 22.02.2011 | US201313913428 | 08.06.2013 | US201514863069 | 23.09.2015 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | US201261657744 | 09.06.2012 | US20731608 | 09.09.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10416625 | ![]() | 17.09.2019 | B2 | US2016132030 | 12.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514725912 | 29.05.2015 | US201462057724 | 30.09.2014 | US201314081895 | 15.11.2013 | US201514725891 | 29.05.2015 | US201514856265 | 16.09.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | US201462094695 | 19.12.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10416205 | ![]() | 17.09.2019 | B2 | US2016091540 | 31.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514725912 | 29.05.2015 | US201514856239 | 16.09.2015 | US201462057747 | 30.09.2014 | US201314081895 | 15.11.2013 | US201514725891 | 29.05.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10371546 | ![]() | 06.08.2019 | B2 | US2017314958 | 02.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361793924 | 15.03.2013 | US201414209815 | 13.03.2014 | US201715650433 | 14.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10371526 | ![]() | 06.08.2019 | B2 | US2017350703 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201715494163 | 21.04.2017 | US201314081899 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10362536 | ![]() | 23.07.2019 | B2 | US2019014539 | 10.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662276810 | 08.01.2016 | US201615274437 | 23.09.2016 | US201816033073 | 11.07.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10318871 | ![]() | 11.06.2019 | B2 | US2017039475 | 09.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US51829206 | 08.09.2006 | US71532405 | 08.09.2005 | US201615299264 | 20.10.2016 | US201314141261 | 26.12.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10305770 | ![]() | 28.05.2019 | B2 | US2018176112 | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | US201815898092 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10276170 | ![]() | 30.04.2019 | B2 | US2013275164 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | US201261657736 | 08.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10255566 | ![]() | 09.04.2019 | B2 | US2012311583 | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10241752 | ![]() | 26.03.2019 | B2 | US2014040748 | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | US201261709766 | 04.10.2012 | US201314046871 | 04.10.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10241644 | ![]() | 26.03.2019 | B2 | US2014033071 | 30.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261647440 | 15.05.2012 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201313894354 | 14.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10206170 | ![]() | 12.02.2019 | B2 | US2017201942 | 13.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662276810 | 08.01.2016 | US201615064406 | 08.03.2016 | US201514725912 | 29.05.2015 | US201615274437 | 23.09.2016 | US201514725891 | 29.05.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10177933 | ![]() | 08.01.2019 | B2 | US2015351145 | 03.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | US201462005764 | 30.05.2014 | US201462094391 | 19.12.2014 | US201514725891 | 29.05.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10057736 | ![]() | 21.08.2018 | B2 | US2013115927 | 09.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201213729597 | 28.12.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10057062 | ![]() | 21.08.2018 | B2 | US2017346630 | 30.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615064406 | 08.03.2016 | US201562171995 | 05.06.2015 | US201715618707 | 09.06.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20250002837 | ![]() | 07.01.2025 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | KR20237017413 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240010057 | ![]() | 23.01.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20220119609 | 21.09.2022 | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180121686 | ![]() | 07.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160010523 | ![]() | 27.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102746046B | ![]() | 26.12.2024 | B1 | KR20230079478 | 07.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20227020185 | 11.01.2011 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102741429B | ![]() | 12.12.2024 | B1 | KR20230096122 | 29.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | KR20227026740 | 04.06.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102622737B | ![]() | 10.01.2024 | B1 | KR20220136304 | 07.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | KR20210128938 | 29.09.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102545095B | ![]() | 16.06.2023 | B1 | KR20220116064 | 19.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | KR20227006342 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102537767B | ![]() | 31.05.2023 | B1 | KR20220088514 | 27.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | KR20217027594 | 11.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102447546B | ![]() | 26.09.2022 | B1 | KR20210122755 | 12.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | KR20190148423 | 19.11.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102429833B | ![]() | 05.08.2022 | B1 | KR20220032119 | 15.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | KR20207037138 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102410557B | ![]() | 22.06.2022 | B1 | KR20210111347 | 10.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20207023927 | 11.01.2011 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102369784B | ![]() | 03.03.2022 | B1 | KR20210000327 | 04.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | KR20197018332 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102312725B | ![]() | 13.10.2021 | B1 | KR20210107145 | 31.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | KR20217006945 | 05.02.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102309489B | ![]() | 07.10.2021 | B1 | KR20190132321 | 27.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | KR20160161496 | 30.11.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102297492B | ![]() | 03.09.2021 | B1 | KR20200101996 | 28.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20207008719 | 11.01.2011 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102293116B | ![]() | 25.08.2021 | B1 | KR20210029840 | 16.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | KR20207034220 | 05.02.2015 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102227177B | ![]() | 12.03.2021 | B1 | KR20200136506 | 07.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102197560B | ![]() | 31.12.2020 | B1 | KR20190077611 | 03.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102186012B | ![]() | 04.12.2020 | B1 | KR20200090960 | 29.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102147926B | ![]() | 25.08.2020 | B1 | KR20200035486 | 03.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102145660B | ![]() | 18.08.2020 | B1 | KR20180052112 | 17.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102138027B | ![]() | 27.07.2020 | B1 | KR20200040907 | 20.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102132146B | ![]() | 08.07.2020 | B1 | KR20200039824 | 16.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102101308B | ![]() | 16.04.2020 | B1 | KR20170017011 | 14.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102101138B | ![]() | 14.04.2020 | B1 | KR20190124345 | 04.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102096222B | ![]() | 01.04.2020 | B1 | KR20190032641 | 27.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102048375B | ![]() | 25.11.2019 | B1 | KR20160142802 | 13.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101995660B | ![]() | 02.07.2019 | B1 | KR20170141274 | 22.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101962243B | ![]() | 27.03.2019 | B1 | KR20170104006 | 13.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101948492B | ![]() | 14.02.2019 | B1 | KR20180039179 | 17.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261727554 | 16.11.2012 | WO2013US70123 | 14.11.2013 | US201313888232 | 06.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101947229B | ![]() | 12.02.2019 | B1 | KR20160014047 | 05.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101915185B | ![]() | 06.11.2018 | B1 | KR20170076803 | 04.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101847508B | ![]() | 10.04.2018 | B1 | KR20170117609 | 23.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261727554 | 16.11.2012 | WO2013US70123 | 14.11.2013 | US201313888232 | 06.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101834624B | ![]() | 05.03.2018 | B1 | KR20160003138 | 08.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US41173 | 05.06.2014 | US201313913421 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101816375B | ![]() | 08.01.2018 | B1 | KR20160003103 | 08.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US41159 | 05.06.2014 | US201313913428 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101786537B | ![]() | 18.10.2017 | B1 | KR20150081322 | 13.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261727554 | 16.11.2012 | WO2013US70123 | 14.11.2013 | US201313888232 | 06.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101775708B | ![]() | 06.09.2017 | B1 | KR20160105995 | 08.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101752035B | ![]() | 28.06.2017 | B1 | KR20140014300 | 05.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101706138B | ![]() | 13.02.2017 | B1 | KR20160098522 | 18.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101697416B | ![]() | 17.01.2017 | B1 | KR20150003877 | 09.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261647440 | 15.05.2012 | US201313894354 | 14.05.2013 | WO2013US41233 | 15.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101683083B | ![]() | 07.12.2016 | B1 | KR20130035983 | 09.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101654580B | ![]() | 06.09.2016 | B1 | KR20120137435 | 20.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101617665B | ![]() | 03.05.2016 | B1 | KR20140082771 | 02.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | WO2012US56382 | 20.09.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101593739B | ![]() | 12.02.2016 | B1 | KR20120120316 | 01.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101588081B | ![]() | 25.01.2016 | B1 | KR20120137440 | 20.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101588080B | ![]() | 25.01.2016 | B1 | KR20120137434 | 20.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101577493B | ![]() | 14.12.2015 | B1 | KR20130000423 | 02.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101555743B | ![]() | 25.09.2015 | B1 | KR20120138827 | 26.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101555742B | ![]() | 25.09.2015 | B1 | KR20120137425 | 20.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101543195B | ![]() | 07.08.2015 | B1 | KR20140084325 | 04.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | WO2009US42728 | 04.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101536044B | ![]() | 13.07.2015 | B1 | KR20130005310 | 15.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | WO2009US42728 | 04.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101511833B | ![]() | 14.04.2015 | B1 | KR20120138826 | 26.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101511832B | ![]() | 15.04.2015 | B1 | KR20120137424 | 20.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101511831B | ![]() | 14.04.2015 | B1 | KR20120136417 | 18.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101275466B | ![]() | 14.06.2013 | B1 | KR20110014194 | 10.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024122975 | ![]() | 10.09.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | JP2020109934 | 25.06.2020 | JP2024011222 | 29.01.2024 | JP2022114276 | 15.07.2022 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7498419B | ![]() | 12.06.2024 | B2 | JP2024056744 | 23.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | JP2020109934 | 25.06.2020 | JP2022114276 | 15.07.2022 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7631460B | ![]() | 18.02.2025 | B2 | JP2023169360 | 29.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2022086561 | 27.05.2022 | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | JP2020125245 | 22.07.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7498402B | ![]() | 12.06.2024 | B2 | JP2022163036 | 25.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | JP2020109934 | 25.06.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7357113B | ![]() | 05.10.2023 | B2 | JP2022119908 | 17.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | JP2020125245 | 22.07.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6922057B | ![]() | 18.08.2021 | B2 | JP2021013173 | 04.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | JP2020082199 | 07.05.2020 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7082645B | ![]() | 08.06.2022 | B2 | JP2020194557 | 03.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7213206B | ![]() | 26.01.2023 | B2 | JP2020173835 | 22.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6773933B | ![]() | 21.10.2020 | B2 | JP2020129399 | 27.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6828962B | ![]() | 10.02.2021 | B2 | JP2018116728 | 26.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6166484B | ![]() | 19.07.2017 | B2 | JP2017511028 | 13.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6498725B | ![]() | 10.04.2019 | B2 | JP2017224300 | 21.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6754716B | ![]() | 16.09.2020 | B2 | JP2017142833 | 17.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6740162B | ![]() | 12.08.2020 | B2 | JP2017139004 | 10.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017016683 | ![]() | 19.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6545155B | ![]() | 17.07.2019 | B2 | JP2016529580 | 23.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016001477 | ![]() | 07.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6193361B | ![]() | 06.09.2017 | B2 | JP2015519838 | 09.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261647440 | 15.05.2012 | US201313894354 | 14.05.2013 | WO2013US41233 | 15.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6353786B | ![]() | 04.07.2018 | B2 | JP2015501022 | 08.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | WO2012US56382 | 20.09.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6285883B | ![]() | 28.02.2018 | B2 | JP2015122104 | 02.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6144256B | ![]() | 07.06.2017 | B2 | JP2014518409 | 28.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6353711B | ![]() | 04.07.2018 | B2 | JP2014222517 | 27.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5948372B | ![]() | 06.07.2016 | B2 | JP2014222516 | 27.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6193181B | ![]() | 06.09.2017 | B2 | JP2014222515 | 27.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5956511B | ![]() | 27.07.2016 | B2 | JP2014222514 | 27.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5957038B | ![]() | 27.07.2016 | B2 | JP2014222513 | 27.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5973500B | ![]() | 23.08.2016 | B2 | JP2014222512 | 27.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6356501B | ![]() | 11.07.2018 | B2 | JP2014222511 | 27.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6175413B | ![]() | 02.08.2017 | B2 | JP2014222510 | 27.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6027052B | ![]() | 16.11.2016 | B2 | JP2014222509 | 27.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013517566 | ![]() | 16.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5698203B | ![]() | 08.04.2015 | B2 | JP2013080476 | 02.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5781043B | ![]() | 16.09.2015 | B2 | JP2013047954 | 07.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5137899B | ![]() | 06.02.2013 | B2 | JP2010033548 | 12.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4478695 | ![]() | 05.03.2025 | A3 | EP4478695 | 18.12.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP14733910 | 30.05.2014 | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | EP22153301 | 30.05.2014 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4336804 | ![]() | 12.06.2024 | A3 | EP4336804 | 13.03.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | EP20200608 | 05.02.2015 | EP17190748 | 05.02.2015 | EP15706972 | 05.02.2015 | EP22154974 | 05.02.2015 | EP19151690 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4325814 | ![]() | 01.05.2024 | A3 | EP4325814 | 21.02.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35208 | 01.06.2016 | US201615064406 | 08.03.2016 | US201562171995 | 05.06.2015 | EP19190233 | 01.06.2016 | EP16729158 | 01.06.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4236211 | ![]() | 20.09.2023 | A3 | EP4236211 | 30.08.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462005764 | 30.05.2014 | US201462094391 | 19.12.2014 | EP19170567 | 29.05.2015 | WO2015US33376 | 29.05.2015 | EP15731760 | 29.05.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4198733 | ![]() | 21.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615180046 | 12.06.2016 | WO2016US44118 | 26.07.2016 | EP22155507 | 26.07.2016 | EP16748234 | 26.07.2016 | US201562199892 | 31.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4036731 | ![]() | 05.04.2023 | B1 | EP4036731 | 03.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615180046 | 12.06.2016 | WO2016US44118 | 26.07.2016 | EP16748234 | 26.07.2016 | US201562199892 | 31.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4021045 | ![]() | 20.03.2024 | B1 | EP4021045 | 29.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | EP20200608 | 05.02.2015 | EP17190748 | 05.02.2015 | EP15706972 | 05.02.2015 | EP19151690 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4009166 | ![]() | 06.11.2024 | B1 | EP4009166 | 08.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14733910 | 30.05.2014 | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3998762 | ![]() | 07.08.2024 | B1 | EP3998762 | 18.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US16216 | 02.02.2016 | EP16706081 | 02.02.2016 | US201562111100 | 02.02.2015 | EP18213157 | 02.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3889546 | ![]() | 06.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | WO2014US25117 | 12.03.2014 | EP14722422 | 12.03.2014 | US201314081902 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3872586 | ![]() | 26.01.2022 | A3 | EP3872586 | 01.09.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462005764 | 30.05.2014 | WO2015US33369 | 29.05.2015 | US201462094391 | 19.12.2014 | EP15775014 | 29.05.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3799395 | ![]() | 20.07.2022 | B1 | EP3799395 | 31.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | EP17190748 | 05.02.2015 | EP15706972 | 05.02.2015 | EP19151690 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3594828 | ![]() | 15.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | EP14737370 | 04.06.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3591943 | ![]() | 29.05.2024 | B1 | EP3591943 | 08.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35208 | 01.06.2016 | US201615064406 | 08.03.2016 | US201562171995 | 05.06.2015 | EP16729158 | 01.06.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3537238 | ![]() | 23.08.2023 | B1 | EP3537238 | 11.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462005764 | 30.05.2014 | US201462094391 | 19.12.2014 | WO2015US33376 | 29.05.2015 | EP15731760 | 29.05.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3493509 | ![]() | 21.10.2020 | B1 | EP3493509 | 05.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | EP17190748 | 05.02.2015 | EP15706972 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3484134 | ![]() | 23.03.2022 | B1 | EP3484134 | 15.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US16216 | 02.02.2016 | EP16706081 | 02.02.2016 | US201562111100 | 02.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3483807 | ![]() | 15.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | EP12727027 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3454227 | ![]() | 13.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US98798210 | 18.01.2010 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | EP11707939 | 11.01.2011 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | US201161295774 | 10.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3445002 | ![]() | 24.07.2019 | B1 | EP3445002 | 20.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17150108 | 03.01.2017 | US201662276809 | 08.01.2016 | US201662348989 | 12.06.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3392876 | ![]() | 24.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | EP12186663 | 28.09.2012 | EP16195814 | 28.09.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3329376 | ![]() | 27.04.2022 | B1 | EP3329376 | 06.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615180046 | 12.06.2016 | WO2016US44118 | 26.07.2016 | US201562199892 | 31.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3313050 | ![]() | 23.01.2019 | B1 | EP3313050 | 25.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | EP15706972 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3281388 | ![]() | 07.08.2019 | B1 | EP3281388 | 14.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35208 | 01.06.2016 | US201615064406 | 08.03.2016 | US201562171995 | 05.06.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3254452 | ![]() | 26.12.2018 | B1 | EP3254452 | 13.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US16216 | 02.02.2016 | US201562111100 | 02.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3201773 | ![]() | 09.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462057727 | 30.09.2014 | WO2015US50433 | 16.09.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3200185 | ![]() | 02.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | EP12186663 | 28.09.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3190747 | ![]() | 14.11.2018 | B1 | EP3190747 | 12.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662276809 | 08.01.2016 | US201662348989 | 12.06.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3149548 | ![]() | 23.06.2021 | B1 | EP3149548 | 05.04.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462005764 | 30.05.2014 | WO2015US33369 | 29.05.2015 | US201462094391 | 19.12.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3149547 | ![]() | 26.06.2019 | B1 | EP3149547 | 05.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462005764 | 30.05.2014 | US201462094391 | 19.12.2014 | WO2015US33376 | 29.05.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3131023 | ![]() | 15.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | EP11707939 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3103246 | ![]() | 06.12.2017 | B1 | EP3103246 | 14.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3101392 | ![]() | 15.12.2021 | B1 | EP3101392 | 07.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | EP14158182 | 06.03.2014 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081915 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3005668 | ![]() | 19.12.2018 | B1 | EP3005668 | 13.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US41159 | 05.06.2014 | US201313913428 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3005150 | ![]() | 15.06.2016 | A4 | EP3005150 | 13.04.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3005075 | ![]() | 13.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US41173 | 05.06.2014 | US201313913421 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2992418 | ![]() | 16.02.2022 | B1 | EP2992418 | 09.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2972104 | ![]() | 20.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361832850 | 08.06.2013 | US201314081850 | 15.11.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | WO2014US29841 | 14.03.2014 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2946171 | ![]() | 04.08.2021 | B1 | EP2946171 | 25.11.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | WO2014US25117 | 12.03.2014 | US201314081902 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2920693 | ![]() | 05.05.2021 | B1 | EP2920693 | 23.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261727554 | 16.11.2012 | WO2013US70123 | 14.11.2013 | US201313888232 | 06.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2847693 | ![]() | 13.01.2016 | A4 | EP2847693 | 18.03.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261647440 | 15.05.2012 | US201313894354 | 14.05.2013 | WO2013US41233 | 15.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2761860 | ![]() | 23.10.2019 | B1 | EP2761860 | 06.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | WO2012US56382 | 20.09.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2715625 | ![]() | 29.10.2014 | A4 | EP2715625 | 09.04.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2575128 | ![]() | 14.08.2013 | A3 | EP2575128 | 03.04.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2526511 | ![]() | 21.12.2016 | A4 | EP2526511 | 28.11.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2283424 | ![]() | 16.02.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | WO2009US42728 | 04.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113032084 | ![]() | 25.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | CN201480030811 | 04.06.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112666841 | ![]() | 16.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462005764 | 30.05.2014 | US201462094391 | 19.12.2014 | CN201580028720 | 29.05.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111601306B | ![]() | 21.07.2023 | B | CN111601306 | 28.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202010410714 | 06.01.2017 | US201662276809 | 08.01.2016 | US201662348989 | 12.06.2016 | CN201710008835 | 06.01.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111337048B | ![]() | 28.03.2023 | B | CN111337048 | 26.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081911 | 15.11.2013 | WO2014US25121 | 12.03.2014 | CN201480013896 | 12.03.2014 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111289010 | ![]() | 16.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081911 | 15.11.2013 | CN201480013896 | 12.03.2014 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110932888B | ![]() | 13.10.2023 | B | CN110932888 | 27.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261727554 | 16.11.2012 | CN201380068944 | 14.11.2013 | WO2013US70123 | 14.11.2013 | CN201911124058 | 14.11.2013 | US201313888232 | 06.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110413357B | ![]() | 06.09.2022 | B | CN110413357 | 05.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | CN201480032453 | 30.05.2014 | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110388935B | ![]() | 28.04.2023 | B | CN110388935 | 29.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361832850 | 08.06.2013 | CN201910672157 | 14.03.2014 | US201314081850 | 15.11.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | CN201480013892 | 14.03.2014 | WO2014US29841 | 14.03.2014 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110264145B | ![]() | 22.08.2023 | B | CN110264145 | 20.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | CN201280027176 | 01.06.2012 | CN201910143076 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110248019B | ![]() | 26.04.2022 | B | CN110248019 | 17.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US41159 | 05.06.2014 | US201313913428 | 08.06.2013 | CN201480029963 | 05.06.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110232489B | ![]() | 23.05.2023 | B | CN110232489 | 13.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | CN201280027176 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110113427B | ![]() | 02.09.2022 | B | CN110113427 | 09.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35208 | 01.06.2016 | US201615064406 | 08.03.2016 | CN201680031641 | 01.06.2016 | US201562171995 | 05.06.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110110953 | ![]() | 09.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | CN201280027176 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110110952 | ![]() | 09.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | CN201280027176 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110083411B | ![]() | 01.02.2022 | B | CN110083411 | 02.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361832841 | 08.06.2013 | CN201480001136 | 30.05.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110068352B | ![]() | 09.06.2023 | B | CN110068352 | 30.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | WO2014US25112 | 12.03.2014 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | CN201480013916 | 12.03.2014 | CN201910219455 | 12.03.2014 | US201314081915 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109631935B | ![]() | 14.03.2025 | B | CN109631935 | 16.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | CN201480013904 | 12.03.2014 | WO2014US25117 | 12.03.2014 | US201314081902 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109324732B | ![]() | 06.08.2021 | B | CN109324732 | 12.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261647440 | 15.05.2012 | CN201380028060 | 15.05.2013 | US201313894354 | 14.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108337380B | ![]() | 19.08.2022 | B | CN108337380 | 27.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201280058606 | 20.09.2012 | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | WO2012US56382 | 20.09.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108259159B | ![]() | 05.02.2021 | B | CN108259159 | 06.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | CN201580007365 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107851046B | ![]() | 25.02.2022 | B | CN107851046 | 27.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615180046 | 12.06.2016 | WO2016US44118 | 26.07.2016 | US201562199892 | 31.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107683601B | ![]() | 21.05.2019 | B | CN107683601 | 09.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35208 | 01.06.2016 | US201615064406 | 08.03.2016 | US201562171995 | 05.06.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107209655B | ![]() | 11.08.2020 | B | CN107209655 | 26.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US16216 | 02.02.2016 | US201562111100 | 02.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106961334B | ![]() | 19.05.2020 | B | CN106961334 | 18.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662276809 | 08.01.2016 | US201662348989 | 12.06.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106797333B | ![]() | 16.10.2020 | B | CN106797333 | 31.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462057727 | 30.09.2014 | WO2015US50433 | 16.09.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106664226B | ![]() | 22.05.2020 | B | CN106664226 | 10.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462005764 | 30.05.2014 | WO2015US33369 | 29.05.2015 | US201462094391 | 19.12.2014 | US201514725891 | 29.05.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106462123B | ![]() | 22.12.2020 | B | CN106462123 | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462005764 | 30.05.2014 | US201462094391 | 19.12.2014 | WO2015US33376 | 29.05.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105981352B | ![]() | 13.03.2018 | B | CN105981352 | 28.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105808200B | ![]() | 10.09.2019 | B | CN105808200 | 27.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | CN201180013559 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105379234B | ![]() | 19.04.2019 | B | CN105379234 | 02.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US41159 | 05.06.2014 | US201313913428 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105284099B | ![]() | 17.05.2019 | B | CN105284099 | 27.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US41173 | 05.06.2014 | US201313913421 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105283840B | ![]() | 05.07.2019 | B | CN105283840 | 27.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105247511 | ![]() | 13.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105191387B | ![]() | 26.03.2019 | B | CN105191387 | 23.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | WO2014US25112 | 12.03.2014 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081915 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105143828B | ![]() | 13.09.2019 | B | CN105143828 | 09.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | WO2014US25117 | 12.03.2014 | US201314081902 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105051496B | ![]() | 17.01.2020 | B | CN105051496 | 11.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081911 | 15.11.2013 | WO2014US25121 | 12.03.2014 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105051495B | ![]() | 23.07.2019 | B | CN105051495 | 11.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361832850 | 08.06.2013 | US201314081850 | 15.11.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | WO2014US29841 | 14.03.2014 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105051494B | ![]() | 26.01.2018 | B | CN105051494 | 11.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | WO2014US25115 | 12.03.2014 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081896 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104937553B | ![]() | 19.11.2019 | B | CN104937553 | 23.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261727554 | 16.11.2012 | WO2013US70123 | 14.11.2013 | US201313888232 | 06.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104685470B | ![]() | 30.11.2018 | B | CN104685470 | 03.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40416 | 30.05.2014 | US201361832841 | 08.06.2013 | US201414291688 | 30.05.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104335205B | ![]() | 19.10.2018 | B | CN104335205 | 04.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261647440 | 15.05.2012 | US201313894354 | 14.05.2013 | WO2013US41233 | 15.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103959751 | ![]() | 30.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | WO2012US56382 | 20.09.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103582896 | ![]() | 12.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103226949B | ![]() | 01.02.2017 | B | CN103226949 | 31.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102792320B | ![]() | 24.02.2016 | B | CN102792320 | 21.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3077914 | ![]() | 01.08.2023 | C | CA3077914 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA3000109 | 11.01.2011 | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3023918 | ![]() | 29.11.2022 | C | CA3023918 | 30.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | CA2791277 | 28.09.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3000109 | ![]() | 23.06.2020 | C | CA3000109 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | CA2954559 | 11.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2954559 | ![]() | 04.12.2018 | C | CA2954559 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | CA2793118 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2793743 | ![]() | 06.10.2015 | C | CA2793743 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | CA2787351 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2793741 | ![]() | 31.05.2016 | C | CA2793741 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | CA2787351 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2793248 | ![]() | 01.11.2016 | C | CA2793248 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | CA2787351 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2793118 | ![]() | 08.08.2017 | C | CA2793118 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | CA2787351 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2793002 | ![]() | 21.06.2016 | C | CA2793002 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | CA2787351 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2792570 | ![]() | 31.05.2016 | C | CA2792570 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | CA2787351 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2792442 | ![]() | 17.05.2016 | C | CA2792442 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | CA2787351 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2792412 | ![]() | 22.12.2015 | C | CA2792412 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | CA2787351 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2791791 | ![]() | 18.10.2016 | C | CA2791791 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | CA2787351 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2791277 | ![]() | 15.01.2019 | C | CA2791277 | 30.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2787351 | ![]() | 08.12.2015 | C | CA2787351 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2024205472 | ![]() | 22.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2019213441 | 09.08.2019 | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | AU2021201449 | 05.03.2021 | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | AU2024205472 | 02.08.2024 | AU2022224855 | 02.09.2022 | AU2014275224 | 30.05.2014 | AU2017268569 | 29.11.2017 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2023202682 | ![]() | 18.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | AU2019200296 | 17.01.2019 | AU2014274913 | 04.06.2014 | AU2021240130 | 27.09.2021 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | AU2023202682 | 02.05.2023 | AU2019283923 | 19.12.2019 | AU2017204217 | 21.06.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2022224855B | ![]() | 02.05.2024 | B2 | AU2022224855 | 29.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2019213441 | 09.08.2019 | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | AU2021201449 | 05.03.2021 | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | AU2022224855 | 02.09.2022 | AU2014275224 | 30.05.2014 | AU2017268569 | 29.11.2017 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021240130B | ![]() | 06.04.2023 | B9 | AU2021240130B | 02.02.2023 | B2 | AU2021240130 | 28.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | AU2019200296 | 17.01.2019 | AU2014274913 | 04.06.2014 | AU2021240130 | 27.09.2021 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | AU2019283923 | 19.12.2019 | AU2017204217 | 21.06.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021201449B | ![]() | 23.06.2022 | B2 | AU2021201449 | 25.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2019213441 | 09.08.2019 | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | AU2021201449 | 05.03.2021 | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | AU2014275224 | 30.05.2014 | AU2017268569 | 29.11.2017 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020220088B | ![]() | 18.02.2021 | B2 | AU2020220088 | 03.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | AU2020220088 | 18.08.2020 | AU2018204265 | 14.06.2018 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | AU2016204091 | 17.06.2016 | AU2012261958 | 01.06.2012 | AU2020202534 | 15.04.2020 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020202534B | ![]() | 04.06.2020 | B2 | AU2020202534 | 07.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | AU2018204265 | 14.06.2018 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | AU2016204091 | 17.06.2016 | AU2012261958 | 01.06.2012 | AU2020202534 | 15.04.2020 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019283923 | ![]() | 16.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | AU2019200296 | 17.01.2019 | AU2014274913 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | AU2019283923 | 19.12.2019 | AU2017204217 | 21.06.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019213441C | ![]() | 03.06.2021 | C1 | AU2019213441B | 11.03.2021 | B9 | AU2019213441B | 28.01.2021 | B2 | AU2019213441 | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2019213441 | 09.08.2019 | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | AU2014275224 | 30.05.2014 | AU2017268569 | 29.11.2017 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019200296B | ![]() | 19.09.2019 | B2 | AU2019200296 | 07.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | AU2019200296 | 17.01.2019 | AU2014274913 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | AU2017204217 | 21.06.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018204265C | ![]() | 25.06.2020 | C1 | AU2018204265B | 12.03.2020 | B2 | AU2018204265 | 05.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | AU2018204265 | 14.06.2018 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | AU2016204091 | 17.06.2016 | AU2012261958 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017268569B | ![]() | 13.06.2019 | B2 | AU2017268569 | 21.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | AU2014275224 | 30.05.2014 | AU2017268569 | 29.11.2017 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017261594B | ![]() | 15.08.2019 | B2 | AU2017261594 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | AU2014235246 | 12.03.2014 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | WO2014US25117 | 12.03.2014 | US201314081902 | 15.11.2013 | AU2017261594 | 17.11.2017 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017204217B | ![]() | 18.10.2018 | B2 | AU2017204217 | 13.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | AU2014274913 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | AU2017204217 | 21.06.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016215440B | ![]() | 14.03.2019 | B2 | AU2016215440 | 17.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US16216 | 02.02.2016 | US201562111100 | 02.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016204091B | ![]() | 15.03.2018 | B2 | AU2016204091 | 07.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | AU2016204091 | 17.06.2016 | AU2012261958 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016200568 | ![]() | 18.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2012316484 | 20.09.2012 | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | AU2016200568 | 29.01.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015214079C | ![]() | 19.01.2017 | C1 | AU2015214079B | 08.09.2016 | B2 | AU2015214079 | 18.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | WO2015US14639 | 05.02.2015 | US201514614914 | 05.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014275224B | ![]() | 31.08.2017 | B2 | AU2014275224 | 24.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014274913B | ![]() | 11.05.2017 | B2 | AU2014274913 | 12.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014235248B | ![]() | 11.05.2017 | B2 | AU2014235248 | 24.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081911 | 15.11.2013 | WO2014US25121 | 12.03.2014 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014235246B | ![]() | 17.08.2017 | B2 | AU2014235246 | 24.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | WO2014US25117 | 12.03.2014 | US201314081902 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014235245B | ![]() | 02.03.2017 | B2 | AU2014235245 | 24.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | WO2014US25115 | 12.03.2014 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081896 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014235244B | ![]() | 13.04.2017 | B2 | AU2014235244 | 24.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | WO2014US25112 | 12.03.2014 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081915 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014100585B | ![]() | 12.03.2015 | B4 | AU2014100585 | 03.07.2014 | A4 | Priority number | Date | US201361832841 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014100584B | ![]() | 05.03.2015 | B4 | AU2014100584 | 03.07.2014 | A4 | Priority number | Date | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013344629B | ![]() | 02.03.2017 | B2 | AU2013344629 | 04.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261727554 | 16.11.2012 | WO2013US70123 | 14.11.2013 | US201313888232 | 06.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013262803B | ![]() | 21.07.2016 | B2 | AU2013262803 | 27.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261647440 | 15.05.2012 | US201313894354 | 14.05.2013 | WO2013US41233 | 15.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012316484 | ![]() | 17.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | WO2012US56382 | 20.09.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012261958B | ![]() | 21.04.2016 | B2 | AU2012261958 | 16.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113251127 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251118 | 30.09.2011 | US201161493201 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40571 | 01.06.2012 | US201113251088 | 30.09.2011 | US201113251104 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012232977 | ![]() | 18.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012101191B | ![]() | 09.05.2013 | B4 | AU2012101191 | 25.10.2012 | A4 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011205426B | ![]() | 16.01.2014 | B2 | AU2011205426 | 23.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010254812 | ![]() | 12.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US37378 | 04.06.2010 | US47947709 | 05.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009246654B | ![]() | 04.10.2012 | B2 | AU2009246654 | 19.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | WO2009US42728 | 04.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2946172 | ![]() | 25.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081911 | 15.11.2013 | WO2014US25121 | 12.03.2014 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102012024861 | 09.02.2021 | B1 | BR102012024861 | 14.02.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012017826 | 05.01.2021 | B1 | BR112012017826 | 01.09.2020 | A8 | BR112012017826 | 26.09.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012028965 | 23.03.2021 | B1 | BR122012028965 | 27.03.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | BR112012017826 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012028966 | 30.11.2021 | B8 | BR122012028966 | 06.04.2021 | B1 | BR122012028966 | 30.07.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | BR112012017826 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012028968 | 23.03.2021 | B1 | BR122012028968 | 30.07.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | BR112012017826 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012028969 | 05.01.2021 | B1 | BR122012028969 | 30.07.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | BR112012017826 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012028970 | 23.03.2021 | B1 | BR122012028970 | 30.07.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | BR112012017826 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012028971 | 23.03.2021 | B1 | BR122012028971 | 30.07.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | BR112012017826 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012028972 | 23.03.2021 | B1 | BR122012028972 | 01.09.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | BR112012017826 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012028973 | 23.03.2021 | B1 | BR122012028973 | 30.07.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | BR112012017826 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012028974 | 23.03.2021 | B1 | BR122012028974 | 30.07.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | BR112012017826 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0912741 | 13.10.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | WO2009US42728 | 04.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3203167 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | CA3077914 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101582053B | 22.01.2014 | B | CN101582053 | 18.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103778082B | 05.04.2017 | B | CN103778082 | 07.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | CN200910140597 | 12.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102012019178 | 04.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202014004555U | 18.09.2014 | U1 | Priority number | Date | US201361832841 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202014004560U | 12.09.2014 | U1 | Priority number | Date | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2459956 | 25.08.2010 | B | GB2459956 | 18.11.2009 | A | GB0907592D0 | 10.06.2009 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2472482 | 21.09.2011 | B | GB2472482 | 09.02.2011 | A | GB201009318D0 | 21.07.2010 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US47947709 | 05.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2490444 | 31.10.2012 | A | GB201213633D0 | 12.09.2012 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2495222 | 26.10.2016 | B | GB2495222 | 03.04.2013 | A | GB201217449D0 | 14.11.2012 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1137831 | 06.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1200621 | 07.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113250947 | 30.09.2011 | WO2012US56382 | 20.09.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1205312 | 11.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261647440 | 15.05.2012 | US201313894354 | 14.05.2013 | WO2013US41233 | 15.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1206835 | 15.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261647440 | 15.05.2012 | US201313894354 | 14.05.2013 | WO2013US41233 | 15.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1219144 | 24.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414291970 | 30.05.2014 | WO2014US40415 | 30.05.2014 | US201361832842 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1220023 | 21.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1222726 | 07.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US40961 | 04.06.2014 | US201313913336 | 07.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1223694 | 04.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US41173 | 05.06.2014 | US201313913421 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1224110 | 11.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US41159 | 05.06.2014 | US201313913428 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2010012494 | 21.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US11996008 | 13.05.2008 | WO2009US42728 | 04.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012008369 | 12.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012011426 | 01.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022015432 | 11.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022015433 | 11.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX338784 | 02.05.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX342072 | 13.09.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX348250 | 05.06.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL2009544B | 24.05.2017 | B1 | NL2009544 | 03.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL2012965C2 | 10.03.2015 | C2 | NL2012965 | 09.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361832841 | 08.06.2013 | US201414291688 | 30.05.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2541219 | 10.02.2015 | C2 | RU2012135502 | 27.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | WO2011US20861 | 11.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2542937 | 27.02.2015 | C2 | RU2012141604 | 10.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113250854 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2541202 | 10.02.2015 | C2 | RU2012144605 | 27.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2546605 | 10.04.2015 | C2 | RU2012144606 | 10.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2541208 | 10.02.2015 | C2 | RU2012144637 | 10.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2544787 | 20.03.2015 | C2 | RU2012144639 | 10.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2012144640 | 10.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2546604 | 10.04.2015 | C2 | RU2012144643 | 10.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2541221 | 10.02.2015 | C2 | RU2012144644 | 10.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2556416 | 10.07.2015 | C2 | RU2012144647 | 10.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2546606 | 10.04.2015 | C2 | RU2012144648 | 10.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2653250 | 07.05.2018 | C2 | RU2015120954 | 27.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2018112505 | 02.09.2021 | A3 | RU2018112505 | 10.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US98798211 | 10.01.2011 | US29577410 | 18.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI506619B | 01.11.2015 | B | TW201112228 | 01.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US47947709 | 05.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI561420B | 11.12.2016 | B | TW201431730 | 16.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261727554 | 16.11.2012 | US201313888232 | 06.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI577969B | 11.04.2017 | B | TW201502475 | 16.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201313843796 | 15.03.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081895 | 15.11.2013 | US201314081899 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI515640B | 01.01.2016 | B | TW201506759 | 16.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361832841 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI620430B | 01.04.2018 | B | TW201540034 | 16.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI578830B | 11.04.2017 | B | TW201607358 | 16.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462005764 | 30.05.2014 | US201462094391 | 19.12.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI576755B | 01.04.2017 | B | TW201612729 | 01.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462005764 | 30.05.2014 | US201462094391 | 19.12.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI615054B | 11.02.2018 | B | TW201707497 | 16.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615064406 | 08.03.2016 | US201562171995 | 05.06.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI676372B | 01.11.2019 | B | TW201806353 | 16.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615064406 | 08.03.2016 | US201562171995 | 05.06.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI666903B | 21.07.2019 | B | TW201820840 | 01.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461935967 | 05.02.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2778615 | ![]() | 12.09.2018 | B1 | EP2778615 | 29.07.2015 | A3 | EP2778615 | 17.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081896 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2778614 | ![]() | 20.07.2016 | B1 | EP2778614 | 17.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081915 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI572849B | 01.03.2017 | B | TW201447233 | 16.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081915 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI532976B | 11.05.2016 | B | TW201447234 | 16.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361875753 | 10.09.2013 | US201361800908 | 15.03.2013 | US201361832818 | 08.06.2013 | US201361832928 | 09.06.2013 | US201314081896 | 15.11.2013 | US201361832853 | 08.06.2013 |