EP3003201 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PATIENT-SPECIFIC REPLACEMENT BRACKET FOR AN ORTHODONTIC TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/15] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PATIENT-SPECIFIC REPLACEMENT BRACKET FOR AN ORTHODONTIC TREATMENT, AND BRACKET PRODUCED BY THIS METHOD | ||
[2016/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DW LINGUAL SYSTEMS GMBH Lindenstr. 44 49152 Bad Essen / DE | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIECHMANN, Dirk Am Goslings Siek 4 49152 Bad Essen / DE | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Taruttis, Stefan Georg TARUTTIS Patentanwaltskanzlei Aegidientorplatz 2b 30159 Hannover / DE | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14725978.2 | 14.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014EP59897 | Priority number, date | DE201310209735 | 24.05.2013 Original published format: DE102013209735 | [2016/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014187715 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3003201 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3003201 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/00, A61C7/14 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
A61C7/002 (EP,US);
A61C7/14 (EP,RU,US);
A61C7/145 (US);
A61C7/146 (US);
A61C7/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PATIENTENSPEZIFISCHEN ERSATZBRACKETS FÜR EINE KIEFERORTHOPÄDISCHE BEHANDLUNG | [2016/23] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PATIENT-SPECIFIC REPLACEMENT BRACKET FOR AN ORTHODONTIC TREATMENT | [2016/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ATTACHEMENT ORTHODONTIQUE DE REMPLACEMENT SPÉCIFIQUE AU PATIENT POUR UN TRAITEMENT D'ORTHOPÉDIE MAXILLAIRE | [2016/23] |
Former [2016/15] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PATIENTENSPEZIFISCHEN ERSATZBRACKETS FÜR EINE KIEFERORTHOPÄDISCHE BEHANDLUNG SOWIE NACH DEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTES BRACKET | ||
Former [2016/15] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PATIENT-SPECIFIC REPLACEMENT BRACKET FOR AN ORTHODONTIC TREATMENT, AND BRACKET PRODUCED BY THIS METHOD | ||
Former [2016/15] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ATTACHEMENT ORTHODONTIQUE DE REMPLACEMENT SPÉCIFIQUE AU PATIENT POUR UN TRAITEMENT D'ORTHOPÉDIE MAXILLAIRE, ET ATTACHEMENT ORTHODONTIQUE FABRIQUÉ PAR CE PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 17.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.05.2014 | AL | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | ES | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | HR | 21.09.2016 | IT | 21.09.2016 | LT | 21.09.2016 | LV | 21.09.2016 | MK | 21.09.2016 | MT | 21.09.2016 | NL | 21.09.2016 | PL | 21.09.2016 | RO | 21.09.2016 | RS | 21.09.2016 | SE | 21.09.2016 | SI | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | SM | 21.09.2016 | TR | 21.09.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | NO | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | IS | 21.01.2017 | PT | 23.01.2017 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 14.05.2014 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
TR | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 14.05.2014 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 14.05.2014 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.05.2014 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.09.2016 | |
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 21.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6015289 (ANDREIKO CRAIG A [US], et al) [X] 23 * column 16, line 62 - column 17, line 8 * * column 27, line 60 - column 28, line 27 * * column 44, line 55 - column 45, line 16 * * column 54, line 5 - line 38 * [A] 1; | [XA]WO0185047 (ORAMETRIX INC [US]) [X] 23 * page 22, line 18 - page 26, line 15 * * claim 19 * [A] 1; | [XA]US2009017410 (RABY RICHARD E [US], et al) [X] 23 * paragraph [0047] * * the whole document * [A] 1; | [XA]US2003152884 (WIECHMANN DIRK [DE], et al) [X] 23 * the whole document * [A] 1 |